Jones et al v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc

Plaintiff: Stephen G Jones and Cynthia L Jones
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv01322
Filed: November 7, 2011
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Stephens
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2016 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the McCormick plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Proclude Expert Testimony of Defendant's Witness, William Hathaway [docket no. 275 in case no. CIV-11-1272-M] (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/20/2016. (ks)
March 25, 2016 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Halliburton's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Injunctive Relief Claim, abstaining from exercising jurisdiction over plaintiffs' injunctive relief claim, and dismissing plaintiffs' injunctive relief claim (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 3/25/2016. (ks)
March 24, 2016 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 Halliburton's Motion to Strike and/or Compel (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 3/24/2016. (ks)
August 10, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' Daubert motions to exclude the testimony of defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Appraiser, Jerry Dent (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/10/2015. (ks)
July 31, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit Testimony from Defendant's Appraiser, Robert Grace (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/31/2015. (ks)
July 10, 2015 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/10/2015. (ks)
July 2, 2015 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 121 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion and Brief in Support of Summary Judgment Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Show Legally Cognizable Injury (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/2/2015. (ks)
June 10, 2015 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 119 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on the Emotional Distress and/or Mental Anguish Claims of All Plaintiffs in the Above-Captioned Cases Except Plaintiffs Gilley, F. Herndon, M. Herndon, Pace, and L. Wilmes (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/10/2015. (ks)
September 10, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 HESI's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Request for Medical Monitoring Relief and finding that defendants are entitled to judgment on the pleadings as to plaintiffs' requests for medical monitoring relief for any plaintiffs other than those who claim to be presently injured (as more fully set out in the order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/10/2012. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen G Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Robert L Betts
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Peter L Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?