Beavers et al v. Victorian et al
Plaintiff: David Rodney Beavers, Cynthia D Beavers and Morgan A Beavers
Defendant: Lenniere Victorian, Anthony B Copeland, Bee-Line Delivery Service Inc, Owens Corning Roofing and Asphalt LLC and Great Western Leasing and Sales Inc
Cross_claimant: Great Western Leasing and Sales Inc
Cross_defendant: Anthony B Copeland and Lenniere Victorian
Case Number: 5:2011cv01442
Filed: December 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 204 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/2/2014. (mb)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER denying 199 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/27/2014. (mb)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/8/2013. (mb)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER denying 111 Motion to Dismiss; denying 121 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/28/2012. (mb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beavers et al v. Victorian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rodney Beavers
Represented By: Paul A Harris
Represented By: Kevin M Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia D Beavers
Represented By: Paul A Harris
Represented By: Kevin M Coffey
Represented By: Paul A Harris
Represented By: Kevin M Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan A Beavers
Represented By: Paul A Harris
Represented By: Kevin M Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenniere Victorian
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Represented By: Paul M Kolker
Represented By: Brad Leslie Roberson
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony B Copeland
Represented By: Paul M Kolker
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Represented By: Brad Leslie Roberson
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bee-Line Delivery Service Inc
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Represented By: Haylie D Treas
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens Corning Roofing and Asphalt LLC
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Western Leasing and Sales Inc
Represented By: John Brian Brandes
Represented By: Dan S Folluo
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Great Western Leasing and Sales Inc
Represented By: John Brian Brandes
Represented By: Dan S Folluo
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Anthony B Copeland
Represented By: Paul M Kolker
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Represented By: Brad Leslie Roberson
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Lenniere Victorian
Represented By: Paul M Kolker
Represented By: Jerry D Noblin, Jr
Represented By: Brad Leslie Roberson
Represented By: Ronald L Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?