Hobby Lobby Stores Inc et al v. Sebelius et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Mardel Inc, David Green, Barbara Green, Mart Green, Steve Green and Darsee Lett
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Hilda Solis, United States Department of Labor, Timothy F Geithner and United States Department of the Treasury
Amicus: Orrin G Hatch, Daniel R Coats, Thad Cochran, Mike Crapo, Charles Grassley, James M Inhofe, Mitch McConnell, Pat Roberts, Richard Shelby, Wally Herger, Dan Burton, Donald Manzullo, John Mica and Lamar Smith
Case Number: 5:2012cv01000
Filed: September 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER of USCA continuing abatement. Status report due 7/14/14 as to 79 Notice of Appeal filed by United States Department of the Treasury, Timothy F Geithner, Hilda Solis, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Labor (pw)
January 10, 2014 Filing 87 USCA LETTER response to request for a certiorari record re 79 Notice of Appeal (pw)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER of USCA as to 79 Notice of Appeal - Order filed by Clerk of the Court (DEC) continuing abatement. Status report(s) due 05/12/2014 by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., et al. and Kathleen Sebelius, et al. However, if there are any developments in the Supreme Court that would affect the need for continued abatement of this case, the parties are under an obligation to advise the court as soon as reasonably possible. (kw, )
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER of USCA granting Unopposed Motion to Hold Apeal in Abeyance. See order for specifics. (pw)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 83 the parties' joint motion to extend the stay previously entered based on the government's filing of a petition for writ of certiorari that seeks Supreme Court review of the 10th Circuit's 06/27/2013 en bac decision...this case is STAYED pending the Supreme Court's disposition of the government's petition. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/24/2013. (lam)
September 23, 2013 Filing 83 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case by All Defendants. (Bennett, Michelle)
September 20, 2013 Filing 82 PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI re Supreme Court Number:13-354 (pw)
September 18, 2013 Filing 81 Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals USCA Case Number 13-6215 for 79 Notice of Appeal filed by United States Department of the Treasury, Timothy F Geithner, Hilda Solis, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Labor. (pw)
September 18, 2013 Filing 80 PRELIMINARY RECORD LETTER - Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal with Preliminary Record sent to Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals re 79 Notice of Appeal, 76 Order on Motion for Order. (pw)
September 17, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 76 Order on Motion for Order,, by All Defendants. (Bennett, Michelle)
August 19, 2013 Filing 78 ENTER ORDER...in light of the order previously entered by the court the motion of Eric Rasmussen for leave to file an amicus brief in support of plaintiffs' preliminary injuction 70 is stricken as moot. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 08/19/2013. (lam)
July 24, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 19, 2013 before Judge Joe Heaton. Court Reporter: B. Jeanne Ring, RDR, Telephone number 405 820-2067. Transcript of: Motion for Preliminary Injunction Volume: I of I Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2013. (jr, )
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 68 plaintiffs' motion for issuance of a preliminary injunction...defendants, their agents, officers and employees are enjoined and restrained from any effort to apply or enforce as to plaintiffs, the substantive requirements imposed in 42:300gg-12(a)(4) and at issue in this case, or the penalties related thereto until further order of the court; as agreed by the parties further proceedings in this case are stayed until 10/01/2013...see order for further specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/19/2013. (lam)
July 19, 2013 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before the Honorable Joe Heaton...hearing held on plaintiffs' emergency motion 68 for preliminary injunction; counsel for the parties present; court hears oral argument; plaintiffs' motion 68 is granted and this proceeding is STAYED until 10/01/2013; written order to follow. (Court Reporter Jeanne Ring) (lam)
July 11, 2013 Filing 73 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark L Rienzi on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rienzi, Mark)
July 10, 2013 Filing 74 Receipt for Money Received from All Plaintiffs in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500033682 regarding 71 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark L. Rienzi (pw)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Mark L. Rienzi, Esq., leave to appear pro hac vice for plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/10/2013. (lam)
July 10, 2013 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark L. Rienzi by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Geister, Charles)
July 8, 2013 Filing 70 MOTION for Order to file a Brief in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus Curiae Eric Rasmusen. (pw)
June 28, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: hearing on plaintiffs' motion 68 for preliminary injunction set: 07/19/2013 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 304 Honorable Joe Heaton per order 69 . (lam)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order pending hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction; party seeking leave to offer additional evidence shall do so by motion and brief by 07/03/2013...any response to such motion shall be filed by 07/10/2013; hearing on plaintiffs' for preliminary injunction is set 07/19/2013 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 304 before the Honorable Joe Heaton. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 06/28/2013. (lam)
June 27, 2013 Filing 68 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Duncan, Stuart)
June 27, 2013 Filing 67 MANDATE ISSUED From USCA 46 Notice of Appeal filed by Mart Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Steve Green, Barbara Green, Mardel Inc, David Green, Darsee Lett (pw)
June 27, 2013 Filing 66 USCA JUDGMENT Reserved and Remanded to US District Court of Western District of Oklahoma as to 46 Notice of Appeal filed by Mart Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Steve Green, Barbara Green, Mardel Inc, David Green, Darsee Lett (pw)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 USCA OPINION Reversed and Remanded to District Court of Western District of Oklahoma as to 46 Notice of Appeal filed by Mart Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Steve Green, Barbara Green, Mardel Inc, David Green, Darsee Lett (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Letter from Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals)(pw)
January 10, 2013 Filing 64 ENTRY of Appearance by Adele A Keim on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Keim, Adele)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 61 Adele Auxier Keim, Esq., leave to appear pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/10/2013. (lam)
January 8, 2013 Filing 62 Receipt for Money Received from All Plaintiffs in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500029811 regarding 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adele Auxier Keim (pw)
January 8, 2013 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adele Auxier Keim by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Geister, Charles)
January 4, 2013 Filing 60 ENTER ORDER the civil status conference 59 set before the court on 02/05/2013 is STRICKEN. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/04/2013. (lam)
January 3, 2013 Filing 59 CIVIL STATUS CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2013 @ 09:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Status Report due by 1/28/2013. (lam)
January 2, 2013 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT LETTER advising transcripts have been electronically filed. re 46 Notice of Appeal filed by Mart Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Steve Green, Barbara Green, Mardel Inc, David Green, Darsee Lett. The record is ready for appeal purposes. (kw, )
December 31, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT before Judge Joe Heaton, re 46 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter B. Jeanne Ring, RDR, Telephone number 405 820-2067. Transcript of: Motion for Preliminary Injunction Volume: I of I Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/1/2013. (jr, )
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER of USCA - The motion for an injunction pending appeal is denied as to 46 Notice of Appeal filed by Mart Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Steve Green, Barbara Green, Mardel Inc, David Green, Darsee Lett (pw)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 the parties' motion motion to stay...further proceedings in this case are stayed pending resolution of plaintiff's appeal to the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals or further order of the court. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/12/2012. (lam)
December 10, 2012 Filing 54 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Pending Appeal by All Defendants. (Bennett, Michelle)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time...defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiffs complaint not later than 12/13/2012. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/03/2012. (lam)
December 3, 2012 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT Order Form re 46 Notice of Appeal that transcripts are necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. Estimated completion date December 27, 2012. (jr, )
November 30, 2012 Filing 51 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Bennett, Michelle)
November 28, 2012 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by All Plaintiffs for proceedings held on 11/01/2012 before Judge Joe Heaton.. (Duncan, Stuart)
November 20, 2012 Filing 49 Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals USCA Case Number 12-6294 for 46 Notice of Appeal filed by Mart Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Steve Green, Barbara Green, Mardel Inc, David Green, Darsee Lett. (pw)
November 20, 2012 Filing 48 USCA Appeal Fee received in the amount of $ 455, receipt number OKW500028848, re 46 Notice of Appeal filed by Mart Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Steve Green, Barbara Green, Mardel Inc, David Green, Darsee Lett (pw)
November 19, 2012 Filing 47 PRELIMINARY RECORD LETTER - Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal with Preliminary Record sent to Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals re 46 Notice of Appeal (pw)
November 19, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 45 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 455. (Duncan, Stuart)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 6 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/19/2012. (lam)
November 17, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Opening Brief in Support (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Eric)
November 1, 2012 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Joe Heaton...hearing held on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 6 ; arguments from counsel heard; court to enter written order. (Court Reporter Jeanne Ring) (lam)
October 29, 2012 Filing 42 REPLY by Plaintiffs Barbara Green, David Green, Mart Green, Steve Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Darsee Lett, Mardel Inc re 41 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Duncan, Stuart)
October 22, 2012 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Opening Brief in Support filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bennett, Michelle)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 37 defendants' motion for leave to file response brief not exceeding 40 pages; and granting plaintiffs' request for additional pages and their reply brief may be up to 25 pages in length. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/17/2012. (lam)
October 17, 2012 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by All Defendants. (Bennett, Michelle)
October 17, 2012 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 37 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by All Plaintiffs. (Baxter, Eric)
October 16, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Bennett, Michelle)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 34 various currently serving Members of Congress' motion for leave to file an amicus brief...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/15/2012. (lam)
October 11, 2012 Filing 35 ENTRY of Appearance by Carrie L Vaughn on behalf of Dan Burton, Daniel R Coats, Thad Cochran, Mike Crapo, Charles Grassley, Orrin G Hatch, Wally Herger, James M Inhofe, Donald Manzullo, Mitch McConnell, John Mica, Pat Roberts, Richard Shelby, Lamar Smith (Vaughn, Carrie)
October 11, 2012 Filing 34 UNOPPOSED MOTION to File Amicus Brief by Dan Burton, Daniel R Coats, Thad Cochran, Mike Crapo, Charles Grassley, Orrin G Hatch, Wally Herger, James M Inhofe, Donald Manzullo, Mitch McConnell, John Mica, Pat Roberts, Richard Shelby, Lamar Smith. (Lester, Andrew)
October 11, 2012 Filing 33 AMICUS CURIAE APPEARANCE entered by Andrew W Lester on behalf of Orrin G Hatch, Daniel R Coats, Thad Cochran, Mike Crapo, Charles Grassley, James M Inhofe, Mitch McConnell, Pat Roberts, Richard Shelby, Wally Herger, Dan Burton, Donald Manzullo, John Mica, Lamar Smith. (Lester, Andrew)
October 10, 2012 Filing 32 CORRECTED ORDER continuing hearing on plaintiffs' motion 6 for preliminary injunction to: 11/1/2012 @ 09:00 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Joe Heaton. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/10/2012. (lam)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 the government's unopposed motion for continuance...the hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction 6 is CONTINUED to 10/30/2012 @ 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 304. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/10/2012. (lam)
October 9, 2012 Filing 30 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue hearing on motion for preliminary injunction by All Defendants. (Bennett, Michelle)
October 4, 2012 Filing 29 ENTER ORDER...setting plaintiffs' motion 6 for preliminary injunction for hearing on 10/24/2012 @ 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 304 before Honorable Joe Heaton; Defendants' response to plaintiffs' motion 6 is due for filing on 10/22/2012. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/04/2012. (lam)
October 4, 2012 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Michelle R Bennett on behalf of All Defendants (Bennett, Michelle)
October 4, 2012 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION to Expedite filed by All Defendants. (Bennett, Michelle)
October 3, 2012 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for summonses and complaint served on Sanford Coats, U.S. Attorney for the Western District of Oklahoma on 10/03/2012, filed by Plaintiffs Barbara Green, David Green, Mart Green, Steve Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Darsee Lett, Mardel Inc. (Baxter, Eric)
October 3, 2012 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for summonses and complaint served on Eric Holder, U.S. Attorney General on 10/01/2012, filed by Plaintiffs Barbara Green, David Green, Mart Green, Steve Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Darsee Lett, Mardel Inc. (Baxter, Eric)
October 3, 2012 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States Department of the Treasury served on 10/2/2012. (Baxter, Eric)
October 3, 2012 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. Timothy F Geithner served on 10/2/2012. (Baxter, Eric)
October 3, 2012 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States Department of Labor served on 10/1/2012. (Baxter, Eric)
October 3, 2012 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. Hilda Solis served on 10/1/2012. (Baxter, Eric)
October 3, 2012 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 10/1/2012. (Baxter, Eric)
October 3, 2012 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. Kathleen Sebelius served on 10/1/2012. (Baxter, Eric)
September 28, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION to Expedite by All Plaintiffs. (Baxter, Eric)
September 14, 2012 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric S Baxter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baxter, Eric)
September 14, 2012 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Lori H Windham on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Windham, Lori)
September 14, 2012 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart K Duncan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Duncan, Stuart)
September 12, 2012 Filing 14 Receipt for Money Received from All Plaintiffs in the amount of $150.00, receipt number OKW500027311 regarding 12 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kr)
September 12, 2012 Filing 13 Receipt for Money Received from Hartzog Conger Cason Neville on behalf of All Plaintiffs in the amount of $350.00, receipt number OKW500027306 regarding 1 Complaint. (cpp)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 9 S. Kyle Duncan, Esq.'s motion for leave to appear pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/12/2012. (lam)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 8 Lori H. Windham, Esq.'s motion for leave to appear pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/12/2012. (lam)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 7 Eric S. Baxter, Esq.'s motion for leave to appear pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/12/2012. (lam)
September 12, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of S. Kyle Duncan by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Geister, Charles)
September 12, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lori H. Windham by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Geister, Charles)
September 12, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric S. Baxter by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Geister, Charles)
September 12, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Opening Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order [Dkt#30] USDC Colorado)(Geister, Charles)
September 12, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by All Plaintiffs (Geister, Charles)
September 12, 2012 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Derek B Ensminger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ensminger, Derek)
September 12, 2012 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles E Geister, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Geister, Charles)
September 12, 2012 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Timothy F Geithner, Kathleen Sebelius, Hilda Solis, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Labor, United States Department of the Treasury. (pw)
September 12, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Steve Green, David Green, Darsee Lett, Mardel Inc, Barbara Green, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, Mart Green. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobby Lobby Stores Inc et al v. Sebelius et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hobby Lobby Stores Inc
Represented By: Eric S Baxter
Represented By: Stuart K Duncan
Represented By: Derek B Ensminger
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: Lori H Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mardel Inc
Represented By: Eric S Baxter
Represented By: Stuart K Duncan
Represented By: Derek B Ensminger
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: Lori H Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Green
Represented By: Eric S Baxter
Represented By: Stuart K Duncan
Represented By: Derek B Ensminger
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: Lori H Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Green
Represented By: Eric S Baxter
Represented By: Stuart K Duncan
Represented By: Derek B Ensminger
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: Lori H Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mart Green
Represented By: Eric S Baxter
Represented By: Stuart K Duncan
Represented By: Derek B Ensminger
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: Lori H Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Green
Represented By: Eric S Baxter
Represented By: Stuart K Duncan
Represented By: Derek B Ensminger
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: Lori H Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darsee Lett
Represented By: Eric S Baxter
Represented By: Stuart K Duncan
Represented By: Derek B Ensminger
Represented By: Charles E Geister, III
Represented By: Lori H Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Represented By: Michelle R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Michelle R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Solis
Represented By: Michelle R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Michelle R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy F Geithner
Represented By: Michelle R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Michelle R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Orrin G Hatch
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Daniel R Coats
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Thad Cochran
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Mike Crapo
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Charles Grassley
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: James M Inhofe
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Mitch McConnell
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Pat Roberts
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Richard Shelby
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Wally Herger
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Dan Burton
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Donald Manzullo
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: John Mica
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Lamar Smith
Represented By: Andrew W Lester
Represented By: Carrie L Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?