Cheek et al v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc

Plaintiff: Terry Cheek, Cathy Cheek, Wayne Handke, Terri Handke, Sean Hurley, Ronnie James Lindahl, Micheal Riley, Zoa Riley, Gerald Shutts and Hermawati Shutts
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv00116
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Stephens
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/10/2015. (ks)
July 2, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion and Brief in Support of Summary Judgment Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Show Legally Cognizable Injury (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/2/2015. (ks)
June 19, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on the Loss of Prospective Business Profits Claim of Plaintiff Ann Thomas (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/19/2015. (ks)
June 10, 2015 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on the Emotional Distress and/or Mental Anguish Claims of All Plaintiffs in the Above-Captioned Cases Except Plaintiffs Gilley, F. Herndon, M. Herndon, Pace, and L. Wilmes (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/10/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheek et al v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Cheek
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Cheek
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Handke
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Handke
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Hurley
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie James Lindahl
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Riley
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoa Riley
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Shutts
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermawati Shutts
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Robert L Betts
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Peter L Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?