Ross v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Armond Davis Ross
Defendant: Oklahoma Department of Corrections, Justin Jones, Mike Addison, Sgt Bush, Dennis Rose, George Williams, Sam Preston and Mike McMillen
Case Number: 5:2013cv00323
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Shon T. Erwin
Presiding Judge: David L. Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Certificate of Appealability Denied re 86 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/25/15. (jw)
June 18, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 75 Report and Recommendation. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court adopts the Report and recommendation, Doc. No. 75, to the extent it is consistent herewith. Plaintiffs claims against Defendan ts Addison, Preston, and Rose are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and Defendants Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment, Doc. No. 70, is GRANTED, based on the defense of qualified immunity, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/18/15. (jw)
January 16, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court O RDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 62 Report and Recommendation, The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge [Doc. No. 62], as supplemented herein, to the extent it is consistent with this Order. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. No. 60] is DENIED; Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration [Doc. No. 65] is DENIED; Robert Cotners motion to intervene [Doc. No. 66] is DENIED; and Defendants Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 48] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. If Plaintiff seeks to amend his Complaint, the Court grants him leave to do so by February 6, 2015, as more fully set out.Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 1/16/15. (jw)
September 29, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 53 Report and Recommendation, In accordance with the foregoing, the Report and Recommendation of theMagistrate Judge is ADOPTED, as supplemented herein, and Defendants Motion toDismiss [Doc. No. 27] is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/29/14. (jw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Oklahoma Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armond Davis Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McMillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?