Wickware v. Manville

Plaintiff: Vernell Wickware, Jr
Defendant: John Manville
Case Number: 5:2013cv00424
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment (mb)
January 8, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Brief in Response and Objection to Defendant's Motion for Costs as Untimely; Striking 54 Plaintiff's Brief in Response and Objection to Defendant's Motion for Costs. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/8/2015. (mb)
January 26, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion for New Trial and/or Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/26/2015. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wickware v. Manville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernell Wickware, Jr
Represented By: Barrett T Bowers
Represented By: Scott F Brockman
Represented By: Woodrow K Glass
Represented By: Robert B Houston
Represented By: Stanley M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Manville
Represented By: Kristen L Brightmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.