Allen et al v. Halliburton Company et al

Plaintiff: Glynn Allen and Myra Allen
Defendant: Halliburton Company and Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv00715
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Stephens
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' Daubert motions to exclude the testimony of defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Appraiser, Jerry Dent (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/10/2015. (ks)
July 31, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit Testimony from Defendant's Appraiser, Robert Grace (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/31/2015. (ks)
July 27, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Proclude Expert Testimony of Defendant's Witness, Herschel Roberts, as set forth in the Order. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 07/27/15. (jy)
July 23, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Proclude Expert Testimony of Defendant's Witness, Ron Jarman. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 07/23/15. (jy)
July 2, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion and Brief in Support of Summary Judgment Based on Plaintiffs' Failure to Show Legally Cognizable Injury (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/2/2015. (ks)
June 9, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/9/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Halliburton Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynn Allen
Represented By: Edward A Goldman
Represented By: Thomas J Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Allen
Represented By: Edward A Goldman
Represented By: Thomas J Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Company
Represented By: Robert L Betts
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Peter L Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Robert L Betts
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Peter L Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?