Malone v. Trammell
Petitioner: Ricky Ray Malone
Respondent: Anita Trammell
Case Number: 5:2013cv01115
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Pittsburg
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Presiding Judge: Gary M. Purcell
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY re 74 Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/28/16. (ml)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 42 Sealed Motion to Unseal Habeas Petition. The Court orders that portions of the Petition previously sealed, be unsealed; Respondent's Sealed Motion to Unseal to be unsealed; vacating 23 Order sealing. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/8/2016. (mb)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 30 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/5/2015. (mb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricky Ray Malone
Represented By: Robert S Jackson
Represented By: Sarah M Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anita Trammell
Represented By: Seth S Branham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?