Johnson Roofing Inc v. Pacific Tech Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Johnson Roofing Inc
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company, Pacific Tech Construction Inc and Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2013cv01220
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2014 Filing 42 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 11/5/14. (lg)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Paul Sanderford. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 8/21/14. (lg)
August 20, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-1915638 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Brigid)
August 18, 2014 Filing 39 ANSWER to #25 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer, Counterclaim by Johnson Roofing Inc.(Cowan, Calvin)
August 14, 2014 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Johnson Roofing Inc.(Cowan, Calvin)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Allow Johnson Roofing, Inc. Leave to File First Amended Original Complaint. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 8/14/14. (lg)
August 14, 2014 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to file 1st Amended Complaint (with Consent) by Johnson Roofing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (amended complaint))(Cowan, Calvin)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 JOINT Application for Extension of Existing Deadlines; NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE PERMITTED. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 8/6/14. (lg)
August 4, 2014 Filing 34 JOINT MOTION to Continue Existing Deadlines by Johnson Roofing Inc. (Cowan, Calvin)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #27 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 8/4/14. (lg)
July 30, 2014 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state counterclaims filed by Johnson Roofing Inc. (Cowan, Calvin)
July 24, 2014 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state counterclaims filed by Federal Insurance Company, Pacific Tech Construction Inc, Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Bailey, Johnathan)
July 16, 2014 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT re #29 Witness List - Expert by Federal Insurance Company, Pacific Tech Construction Inc, Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Resume of Lee Sykes, #2 Attachment Resume of Cal Miller)(Bailey, Johnathan)
July 15, 2014 Filing 29 Expert Witness List by Defendants Federal Insurance Company, Pacific Tech Construction Inc, Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Resume of Johnathan M. Bailey)(Bailey, Johnathan)
July 3, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION for Order Proposed (Dismissing Counterclaims) by Johnson Roofing Inc. (Cowan, Calvin) NOT A MOTION, DOCUMENT IS AN UNSIGNED PROPOSED ORDER FILED BY COUNSEL Modified on 7/11/2014 (lg).
July 3, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state counterclaims by Johnson Roofing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (subcontract))(Cowan, Calvin)
June 30, 2014 Filing 26 Expert Witness List (Expert Witness Disclosures) by Plaintiff Johnson Roofing Inc. (Cowan, Calvin)
June 20, 2014 Filing 25 FIRST ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants.(Bardell, Alan)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 6/16/14. (lg)
May 16, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bardell, Alan)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/1/2014. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2014 09:00 AM before Honorable Robin J. Cauthron. Motions due by 9/1/2014.. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/6/14. (lg)
February 5, 2014 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Johnathan M Bailey on behalf of Pacific Tech Construction Inc (Bailey, Johnathan)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Johnathan Bailey. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 2/4/14. (lg)
February 3, 2014 Filing 19 Receipt for Money Received from Hayes Mgrini and Gatewood on behalf of All Defendants in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500037842 regarding #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Johnathan Bailey. (cpp)
January 31, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Bardell, Alan)
January 31, 2014 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Johnson Roofing Inc. (Cowan, Calvin)
January 17, 2014 Filing 16 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET (lg)
January 3, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brigid F Kennedy (Kennedy, Brigid)
December 20, 2013 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Bardell, Alan)
December 20, 2013 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Alan W Bardell on behalf of All Defendants (Bardell, Alan)
December 16, 2013 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Johnson Roofing Inc . (Cowan, Calvin)
December 12, 2013 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Calvin L Cowan on behalf of Johnson Roofing Inc (Cowan, Calvin)
December 5, 2013 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson Roofing Inc. All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 USPS Online Delivery Confirmation)(Kennedy, Brigid)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Calvin Cowan. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 12/4/13. (lg)
November 27, 2013 Filing 8 Receipt for Money Received from Lorri Lopez on behalf of Johnson Roofing Inc in the amount of $50.00, receipt number OKW500036594 regarding #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Calvin Cowan. (cpp)
November 22, 2013 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson Roofing Inc. Westchester Fire Insurance Company served on 11/19/2013. (Kennedy, Brigid)
November 22, 2013 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson Roofing Inc. Federal Insurance Company served on 11/19/2013. (Kennedy, Brigid)
November 18, 2013 Filing 5 Receipt for Money Received from Kennedy Law Firm on behalf of Johnson Roofing Inc in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500036394 regarding #1 Complaint. (cpp)
November 18, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Johnson Roofing Inc. (Kennedy, Brigid) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2013: #1 Attachment Request) (lg).
November 18, 2013 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brigid F Kennedy on behalf of Johnson Roofing Inc (Kennedy, Brigid)
November 15, 2013 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Federal Insurance Company, Pacific Tech Construction Inc, Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (njr)
November 15, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company, Pacific Tech Construction Inc, Westchester Fire Insurance Company filed by Johnson Roofing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (njr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Roofing Inc v. Pacific Tech Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Roofing Inc
Represented By: Calvin L Cowan
Represented By: Brigid F Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan W Bardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Tech Construction Inc
Represented By: Alan W Bardell
Represented By: Johnathan M Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan W Bardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?