Evans v. Bryant et al
Petitioner: William David Evans
Respondent: Robert Patton and Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma
Case Number: 5:2014cv00576
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Comanche
Presiding Judge: Charles B Goodwin
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 26 of Magistrate Judge Bernard Jones..the court denies petitioner's habeas petition; a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/26/2017. (lam)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 26 of Magistrate Judge Bernard Jones...the court denies the petitioner's habeas petition. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/10/2017. (lam)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 9 of Magistrate Judge Bernard Jones; the court concludes that petitioner's ineffective assistance claim is not procedurally barred; this matter is referred again to Magistrate Judge Jones for further review of petitioner's claim. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/20/2016. (lam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Bryant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William David Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?