Iofina Inc et al v. Khalev et al
Plaintiff: Iofina Inc, Iofina Natural Gas Inc, Iofina Resources Inc and Iofina Chemical Inc
Defendant: Igor Khalev and Kiva Holding Inc
Case Number: 5:2014cv01328
Filed: December 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting #411 the joint motion to dissolve agreed permanent injunction...the agreed permanent injunction #405 is dissolved. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 03/31/2020. (lam)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange no longer assigned to case.By direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/31/2020. (sr)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 JOINT MOTION to Vacate #405 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction by All Defendants. (Talley, Evan)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 410 NOTICE of Return of Bond (ac)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 409 STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER granting #407 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Release of Temporary Restraining Order Bond and Discharge of Surety (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/27/2018. (ks)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 407 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER granting #403 the parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Judgment (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/24/2018. (ks)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER granting #402 the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Permanent Injunction (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/24/2018. (ks)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting #401 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Drew T Palmer terminated. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/23/2018. (ks)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 403 JOINT MOTION to Vacate #314 Judgment, by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 JOINT MOTION for Permanent Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Palmer, Drew)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER directing the parties to submit to the Court an agreed proposed briefing schedule regarding the revised permanent injunction set forth in the Court's February 17, 2017 Order. Said briefing schedule shall be filed on or before April 20, 2018. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/6/2018. (ks)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 399 USCA MANDATE Issued re #317 Notice of Appeal filed by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Inc. [17-6054] (ac)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER AND JUDGMENT of USCA as to #317 Notice of Appeal filed by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Inc. FRAP 42; Dismissed. Procedural termination after other judicial action. Written, unsigned, unpublished. Judges Briscoe, Baldock and Eid. Oral argument set for 03/22/2018 is vacated & counsel is excused from attendance. [17-6054] (ac)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER denying #390 defendants' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/13/2017. (ks)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 REPLY by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc re #390 MOTION for Judgment for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2017.08.08 Snapp Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2017.08.10 Sigale Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Appellants Memo Brief re Jurisdiction)(Talley, Evan)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 RESPONSE to Motion re #390 MOTION for Judgment for Entry of Final Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - July 21, 2017 Email from Randall Snapp to Evan Talley et al.)(Henry, Andrew)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Redaction of #355 Appeal Transcript,,, #317 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Attachment Volume II of XII, #2 Attachment Volume IV of XII, #3 Attachment Volume V of XII, #4 Attachment Volume VI of XII, #5 Attachment Volume VII of XII, #6 Attachment Volume VIII of XII, #7 Attachment Volume XI of XII) (ee)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Redaction of #358 Appeal Transcript,, (cc)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Redaction of #357 Appeal Transcript,, (cc)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Redaction of #356 Appeal Transcript,, (cc)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MOTION for Judgment for Entry of Final Judgment by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 August 2, 2017 Order)(Talley, Evan)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting #388 Motion to Dismiss defendants' pending counterclaims without prejudice to refiling at a later date. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/25/17. (ac)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 388 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims Without Prejudice by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Posting Temporary Restraining Order Bond (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Receipt for Original Temporary Restraining Order Bond)(Snapp, Randall)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER granting #385 plaintiff's request for redactions (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/6/2017. (ks)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 (Document Restricted)SEALED DOCUMENT by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc (Henry, Andrew)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER granting #383 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Request for Redactions to Trial Transcript and Motion for Setting of Deadlines for Transcript Redactions (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/23/2017. (ks)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MOTION to Seal Document by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Henry, Andrew)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting #369 plaintiffs' Motion for Redaction of Trial Transcript (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/19/2017. (ks)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 SEALED REPLY by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc Re: #369 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc (Henry, Andrew)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #317 Notice of Appeal (pw)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #353 defendants' Motion to Modify Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, to Require Plaintiffs to Post a Bond (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/12/2017. (ks)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting #376 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Redaction of Trial Transcript and Exhibits Thereto and directing plaintiffs to file under seal, in unredacted form, Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Redaction of Trial Transcript and the exhibits thereto. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/12/2017. (ks)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion for Redaction of Trial Transcript and Exhibits Thereto by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #321 plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal as follows: the briefing schedule regarding the revised permanent injunction set forth in the Court's February 17, 2017 Order is hereby STAYED pending plaintiffs' appeal (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/8/2017. (ks)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #323 plaintiffs' Motion to Strike or Deny without Prejudice Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and denying #315 defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees without prejudice to refiling once a final judgment has been entered in this case (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/8/2017. (ks)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #346 plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and striking defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or to Alter or Amend Judgment and Brief in Support [docket nos. 325 and 328]. (the court further reopens this case on cm/ecf) (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/8/2017. (ks)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER of USCA Order filed by Clerk of the Court - Appellees are directed to file a response to appellants motion to seal due 06/16/2017. At this time, briefing on the merits is tolled. If any of the parties contends that the motion for judgment filed in district court does not abate this appeal, they may file a memorandum brief within 10 days. Parties must also notify the court within 10 days of an order disposing of the motion in district court otherwise must file a status report within 21 days if no ruling has been made. The district court clerk shall supplement the preliminary record with final order and related docket entries. as to #317 Notice of Appeal filed by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Inc (pw)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 372 SEALED RESPONSE by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #371 Order on Motion to Seal, #369 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc (Talley, Evan)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER granting #370 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal and directing defendants to file under seal, in unredacted form, their Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Redaction of Trial Transcript with supporting exhibits. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/2/2017. (ks)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MOTION to Seal by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 369 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc (Watson, Tynia)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting #366 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Redaction of Trial Transcript and Exhibits Thereto and directing plaintiffs to file under seal, in unredacted form, Plaintiffs' Motion for Redaction of Trial Transcript and the exhibits thereto. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/22/2017. (ks)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #365 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript Redaction Request. The redaction request for all twelve volumes of the trial transcript shall be due on Thursday, May 25, 2017. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/22/2017. (ks)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Redaction of Trial Transcript and Exhibits Thereto by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 365 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Transcript Redaction Request by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 REPLY by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc re #353 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2016.12.12 Correspondence)(Talley, Evan)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER dismissing #320 defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal for want of jurisdiction (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/12/2017. (ks)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #353 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Henry, Andrew)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #360 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Modify Temporary Restraining Order Or, in the Alternative, to Require Plaintiffs to Post a Bond and Exhibits Thereto. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/10/2017. (ks)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Modify Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, to Require Plaintiffs to Post a Bond and Exhibits Thereto by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 TRANSCRIPT LETTER advising transcripts have been electronically filed re #317 Notice of Appeal filed by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Inc. The record is ready for appeal purposes. (pw)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT before Judge Miles-LaGrange, re #317 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter Christina L. Clark, Telephone number (405) 609-5123. Transcript of: Jury Trial Volume: X of XII Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2017. (cc)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT before Judge Miles-LaGrange, re #317 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter Christina L. Clark, Telephone number (405) 609-5123. Transcript of: Jury Trial Volume: IX of XII Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2017. (cc)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT before Judge Miles-LaGrange, re #317 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter Christina L. Clark, Telephone number (405) 609-5123. Transcript of: Jury Trial Volume: III of XII Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2017. (cc) Modified on 5/4/2017 (mb).
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT before Judge Miles-LaGrange, re #317 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter Emily Eakle, Telephone number 405-609-5403. Transcript of: Jury Trial Volume: I, II, IV, V, VI, VII, VIII, XI, XII of XII Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Volume II of XII, #2 Volume IV of XII, #3 Volume V of XII, #4 Volume VI of XII, #5 Volume VII of XII, #6 Volume VIII of XII, #7 Volume XI of XII, #8 Volume XII of XII)(ee)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 REPLY to Response to Motion re #346 MOTION to Strike #328 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev or to Deem it Effective Upon "Entry of Judgment," with Supporting Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #350 Order on Motion to Seal Document (Talley, Evan)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 RESPONSE in Opposition re #346 MOTION to Strike #328 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev or to Deem it Effective Upon "Entry of Judgment," with Supporting Brief filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10th Cir's 04.06.2017 Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Walls v. Miracorp Docket Sheet)(Talley, Evan)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 REPLY to Response to Motion re #323 MOTION to Strike #315 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #349 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/13/2017. (ks)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MOTION to Seal Document by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT before Judge Miles-LaGrange, re #317 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter Tracy Washbourne, Telephone number 405-609-5505. Transcript of: Motion for permanent injunction Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2017. (tw, )
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 REPLY to Response to Motion re #321 MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 346 MOTION to Strike #328 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev or to Deem it Effective Upon "Entry of Judgment," with Supporting Brief by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 345 RESPONSE in Opposition re #323 MOTION to Strike #315 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Tenth Circuit Order Deferring Ruling on Appellate Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tenth Circuit Order (17-6054))(Snapp, Randall)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER denying #335 plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law or to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/7/2017. (ks)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting #340 defendants' Unopposed Motion to Correct and File Substitute Brief. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/7/2017. (ks)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 341 REPLY by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc re #320 MOTION to Strike #317 Notice of Appeal , #334 Response to Motion, filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Response to MTD, #3 Exhibit 3 - Reply in Support of MTD, #4 Exhibit 4 - 10th Cir. 4/6/17 Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet)(Talley, Evan)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MOTION to Amend/Correct #325 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and File Substitute Brief by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Renewed Motion for JMOL)(Talley, Evan)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 339 REPLY to Response to Motion re #335 MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Response to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 TRANSCRIPT Order Form re #317 Notice of Appeal that transcripts are necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. Estimated completion date 6-5-17. (cc)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 337 RESPONSE to Motion re #335 MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Response to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or to Alter or Amend Judgment filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 336 RESPONSE to Motion re #321 MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Iofina's Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal)(Talley, Evan)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Response to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or to Alter or Amend Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 334 RESPONSE to Motion re #320 MOTION to Strike #317 Notice of Appeal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Appellees' Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed in the Tenth Circuit, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tenth Circuit Order Directing Response to Appellees' Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Appellants' Response to Appellees' Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed in the Tenth Circuit)(Snapp, Randall)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT Order Form by Tracy Washbourne re #317 Notice of Appeal that transcripts necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. Estimated completion date 5/28/17. (tw, )
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 TRANSCRIPT Order Form by emily eakle re #317 Notice of Appeal that transcripts necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. Estimated completion date 5-19-17. (ee)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 TRANSCRIPT Order Form by All Plaintiffs re #317 Notice of Appeal that transcripts are necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. (Snapp, Randall)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 TRANSCRIPT Order Form by All Plaintiffs re #317 Notice of Appeal that transcripts are necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. (Snapp, Randall)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 TRANSCRIPT Order Form by All Plaintiffs re #317 Notice of Appeal that transcripts are necessary. See order form for dates and proceedings. (Snapp, Randall)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 328 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev Re: #327 Order on Motion to Seal, (Talley, Evan)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #322 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal and directing defendants to file under seal, in unredacted form, their Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or to Alter or Amend Judgment with supporting exhibits. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 3/20/2017. (ks)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #324 plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 3/20/2017. (ks)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Igor Khalev. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transcript of Trial Testimony of Darrell Harris, #2 Exhibit 2 - AEO Slip, #3 Exhibit 3 - AEO Slip, #4 Exhibit 4 - AEO Slip, #5 Exhibit 5 - Transcript of Rule 50(a) Motions, #6 Exhibit 6 - AEO Slip, #7 Exhibit 7 - Transcript of Trial Testimony of Dr. Igor Khalev, #8 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs' Sample Verdict Form)(Talley, Evan) (Main Document 325 replaced on 4/7/2017 pursuant to Order #342 ) (ks). Modified on 4/7/2017 (ks).
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MOTION to Strike #315 MOTION for Attorney Fees by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MOTION to Seal Defendants Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or to Alter or Amend Judgment and Supporting Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Appeal by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MOTION to Strike #317 Notice of Appeal by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals USCA Case Number 17-6054 for #317 Notice of Appeal filed by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Inc. (pw)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 318 PRELIMINARY RECORD LETTER - Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal with Preliminary Record sent to Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals re #317 Notice of Appeal (pw)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #312 Order on Motion for Judgment, #314 Judgment, #313 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 1087-2450850. (Henry, Andrew)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 AFFIDAVIT re #315 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - KIVA Invoices (Updated), #2 Exhibit 2 - 2015 AIPLA Survey, #3 Exhibit 3 - KIVA Expenses (Updated))(Talley, Evan)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Sample Verdict Form, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Dr. Becker Rough Draft, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10.30.2015 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of Dorn Depo., #5 Exhibit 5 - 07.15.2016 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - 30(b)(6) Notice)(Talley, Evan)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 JUDGMENT - This action came on for trial before the Court and a jury, the Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange, District Judge, presiding. The issues having been duly tried and the jury having duly reached its verdict (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 2/17/2017. (ks)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #284 plaintiffs' Motion for Permanent Injunction (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 2/17/2017. (ks)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER denying #279 plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment against Defendant KIVA Holding, Inc. (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 1/24/2017. (ks)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER denying #308 defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment against KIVA Holding, Inc. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 1/19/2017. (ks)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 RESPONSE to Motion re #308 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment Against KIVA filed by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MINUTE ORDER shortening plaintiffs' time to file response to #308 defendants' motion for leave to file a sur-reply in support of their opposition to plaintiffs' motion for entry of judgment against KIVA Holding, Inc. and ordering plaintiffs to file their response by January 12, 2017. Additionally, the Court finds that no reply shall be filed except with leave of Court. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 1/11/2017. (ks)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment Against KIVA by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 307 REPLY by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc re #279 MOTION for Judgment Against Defendant Kiva Holding, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Palmer, Drew)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. Amendment to #301 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jury Instructions)(Talley, Evan)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER the Court GRANTS the parties #304 Joint Motion to File Amended Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment against KIVA and for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Reply [docket no. 304]. Defendants shall file their Amended Response Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Judgment against KIVA Holding, Inc. on or before December 28, 2016, and plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before January 5, 2017. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/23/16. (kw)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #279 MOTION for Judgment Against Defendant Kiva Holding, Inc. Responses due by 12/28/2016. Replies due by 1/5/2017. (kw)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 JOINT MOTION to Amend/Correct #301 Response in Opposition to Motion for Entry of Judgment Against KIVA Holding, Inc. and for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Reply by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on 12/23/2016 (kw).
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Evidentiary Hearing re plaintiffs' motion for permanent Injunction held on 12/22/2016. (Court Reporter Tracy Washbourne) (ks)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER granting #300 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Seal Exhibits 3 and 4 to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/21/2016. (ks)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 RESPONSE in Opposition re #279 MOTION for Judgment Against Defendant Kiva Holding, Inc. filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jury Instructions)(Talley, Evan)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Exhibits 3 and 4 to Plaintiffs Reply Brief in Support of their Motion for Permanent Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 299 REPLY by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc re #297 Response in Opposition to Motion, #285 Brief, #284 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trial Transcript Excerpt of Closing Argument, #2 Exhibit 2 - Trial Transcript Excerpt of Khalev Testimony, #3 Exhibit 3 - JX 84, #4 Exhibit 4 - JX 64, #5 Exhibit 5 - Trial Transcript Excerpt of Becker 11/15 Testimony, #6 Exhibit 6 - Trial Transcript Excerpt of Becker 11/16 Testimony)(Henry, Andrew)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Unjust Enrichment Claims by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Palmer, Drew) Modified on 12/20/2016 to reflect complete title of document (ks).
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 RESPONSE in Opposition re #284 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PX079, #2 Exhibit 2 - JX002, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jury Instructions, #4 Exhibit 4 - Verdict Form, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Dr. Becker's Trial Testimony)(Talley, Evan)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER Having carefully reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court DENIES defendants' Motion for Leave to File Oversized Brief in Support of Their Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Permanent Injunction [docket no. 292]. The Court ORDERS defendants to file a response brief that conforms with the standard twenty-five page limit by 6:00 p.m. today, December 16, 2016. Additionally, the Court EXTENDS the deadline for plaintiffs to file their reply to Tuesday, December 20, 2016. denying #292 Motion for Leave to. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/16/2016. (sr)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 REPLY by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc re #292 MOTION for Leave to File Oversized Brief filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 294 RESPONSE in Opposition re #292 MOTION for Leave to File Oversized Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Palmer, Drew)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #290 defendants' Unopposed Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and striking #286 defendant KIVA Holding, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and #287 the Affidavit of Evan W. Talley in Support of KIVA Holding, Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Further, defendant KIVA Holding, Inc. is granted leave to re-file its Motion for Attorneys' Fees after the Court enters its final judgment. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/16/2016. (ks)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION for Leave to File Oversized Brief by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 RESPONSE to Motion re #284 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Brief in Support filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PX079, #2 Exhibit 2 - JX002, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jury Instructions, #4 Exhibit 4 - Verdict Form)(Talley, Evan)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Strike #287 Affidavit, #286 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER denying #266 defendants' Motion for Declaration of Mistrial (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/14/2016. (ks)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs re #266 MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial , #267 Trial Brief (Palmer, Drew)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 AFFIDAVIT re #286 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - KIVA Invoices from Dunlap Codding, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2015 AIPLA Survey, #3 Exhibit 3 - KIVA Legal Expenses)(Talley, Evan)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Dr. Becker Rough Draft, #2 Exhibit 2 - 10.30.2015 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Dorn Depo., #4 Exhibit 4 - 07.15.2016 Letter)(Talley, Evan)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #284 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Non-Disclosure Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of Jury Trial Transcript)(Henry, Andrew)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11-18-16 before Judge Miles-LaGrange. Court Reporter: Christina L. Clark, Telephone number 405-609-5123. Transcript of: Motion Hearing Volume: I of I Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (cc)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MINUTE ORDER setting briefing schedule regarding the issue of plaintiffs' equitable cause of action for unjust enrichment. The parties shall file simultaneous briefs by Tuesday, December 20, 2016, and shall file their responses by Friday, January 6, 2017. No replies shall be filed. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/2/2016. (ks)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #270 plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order Pending a Hearing on Plaintiffs' Request for Permanent Injunction; and setting a hearing on plaintiffs' request for permanent injunction on Thursday, December 22, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/2/2016. (ks)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing (Permanent Injunction Hearing) set for 12/22/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. (ks)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 SURREPLY re #275 Response to Motion, #278 Order on Motion to Strike, #276 Reply, filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MOTION for Judgment Against Defendant Kiva Holding, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email to Court with Vicarious Liability Instruction)(Palmer, Drew)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #277 defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Reply or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Sur-Reply as follows: the Court denies defendants' motion to strike plaintiffs' reply, and the Court grants defendants' motion for leave to file a sur-reply. Defendants shall file their sur-reply by noon on Thursday, December 1, 2016. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/1/2016. (ks)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MOTION to Strike #276 Reply, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Sur-Reply by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 REPLY by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc re #270 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #275 Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trial Transcript Excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Final Pretrial Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Vicarious Liability and Proportion of Fault Instruction and Verdict Form)(Henry, Andrew)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 RESPONSE to Motion re #270 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 274 JURY VERDICT. (ks)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Jury Notes. (ks)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Jury Instructions. (ks)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial completed on 11/28/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/22/2016 (Jury Deliberations). (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESPONSE re #265 Trial Brief regarding Impropriety of Defendants' Closing Argument filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Propriety of Plaintiffs' Closing Argument by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of Jury Trial Transcript)(Henry, Andrew)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Plaintiffs' Closing Argument)(Talley, Evan)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Impropriety of Defendants' Closing Argument by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Henry, Andrew)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/21/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/18/2016. (Court Reporter Christy Clark) (ks)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/17/2016. (Court Reporter Christy Clark) (ks)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SUPPLEMENTAL Proposed Jury Instructions by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/16/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/15/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SUPPLEMENTAL Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Henry, Andrew)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/14/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings; Transcript filed in error. DISREGARD.(ee) Modified on 11/30/2016 (sr).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/10/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/9/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/8/2016. (Court Reporter Christy Clark) (ks)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/7/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial held on 11/4/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER as to the admissibility of plaintiffs' exhibit 18, which the Court took under advisement at the November 1, 2016 conference (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/3/2016. (ks)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER memorializing the rulings made at the pretrial conference and the matters that the Court took under advisement at the pretrial conference (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/3/2016. (ks)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #245 defendants' notice of withdrawal, which the Court construed as a motion to withdraw, and withdrawing #161 defendants Sealed Motion. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/2/2016. (ks)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: In Chambers Conference held on 11/1/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Jury Trial begun (Jury Selection) on 11/1/2016. (Court Reporter Emily Eakle) (ks)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE (other) by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc re #161 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc of Defendants' Withdrawal of Motion to Bifurcate Trial (Talley, Evan)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER approving the Amended Final Pretrial Report. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/1/2016. (ks)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/28/2016. (ks)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 FINAL PRETRIAL REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs' Witness List, #5 Exhibit Defendants' Witness List)(Snapp, Randall)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #238 defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Pretrial Report to Include Amended Joint Exhibit List. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/26/2016. (ks)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #121 plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Arthur Terry Brix (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/25/2016. (ks)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER denying #122 defendants' Motion to Exclude Mr. Darrell Harris from Testifying as an Expert (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/25/2016. (ks)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Amend Joint Pretrial Report to Include Amended Joint Exhibit List by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 11/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. (ks)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2016 11:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. (ks)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ENTER ORDER striking Docket Call scheduled for Wednesday, October 26, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/25/2016. (ks)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER denying #113 plaintiffs' Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Defendants Igor Khalev and KIVA Holding, Inc. (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/19/2016. (ks)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER denying #222 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Plaintiffs to Make an Offer of Proof (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/19/2016. (ks)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 SEALED REPLY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #222 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, #231 Order on Motion for Leave to, #227 Sealed Response (Talley, Evan)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting #230 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/17/2016. (ks)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment with Supporting Exhibits Under Seal by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 SEALED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #114 Sealed Motion (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/14/2016. (ks) Modified on 10/14/2016 (ks).
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #161 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, #226 Order on Motion for Leave to (Watson, Tynia)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #225 Order on Motion for Leave to, #222 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Snapp, Randall)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting #224 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Objection and Response to Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate Trial. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/13/2016. (ks)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #223 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Objection and Response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Plaintiffs to Make an Offer of Proof and Exhibits Thereto. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/13/2016. (ks)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MOTION for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs Objection and Response to Defendants Motion to Bifurcate Trial and Exhibits thereto by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION for Leave Plaintiffs Objection and Response to Defendants Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Plaintiffs to Make an Offer of Proof and Exhibits thereto by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #221 Order on Motion for Leave to (Talley, Evan)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #220 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/11/2016. (ks)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 SEALED REPLY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #211 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Witnesses Who Were Not Consulted in Preparation for 30(b)(6) Deposition, #213 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, #187 Sealed Response, #156 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Talley, Evan)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 REPLY by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc re #190 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #146 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Presenting Evidence or Argument Regarding Witnesses and Exhibits not Timely Disclosed filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SEALED REPLY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #213 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, #186 Sealed Response, #155 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, #210 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony or Evidence at Trial Pertaining to Dr. Khalev's Alleged Sabotage (Talley, Evan)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 SEALED REPLY by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #213 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, #195 Sealed Response, #151 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc (Watson, Tynia)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SEALED REPLY by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #213 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, #194 Sealed Response, #152 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of October 30, 2015 Letter (Henry, Andrew)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 SEALED REPLY by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #148 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, #213 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, #180 Sealed Response (Palmer, Drew)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #209 , #210 and #211 defendants' Motions for Leave to File Document under Seal and #206 , #207 and #208 plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to File under Seal (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/6/2016. (ks)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 AMENDED NOVEMBER CIVIL TRIAL DOCKET: Docket Call set for 10/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. (ks)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Witnesses Who Were Not Consulted in Preparation for 30(b)(6) Deposition by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony or Evidence at Trial Pertaining to Dr. Khalev's Alleged Sabotage by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Presenting Evidence or Testimony at Trial on its Untimely Disclosed Trade Secrets by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of October 30, 2015 Letter from Defendants' Counsel to Plaintiffs' Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Mischaracterizing Plaintiffs' Trade Secret Claims by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Defendant Igor Khalev was Excused from Performing Under His Non-Disclosure Agreement and Non-Compete Agreement with Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Terminate hearings: (ks)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 SEALED REPLY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #122 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, #201 Order on Motion for Leave to,,, #162 Sealed Response (Talley, Evan)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 204 SEALED REPLY by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #163 Sealed Response, #121 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, #201 Order on Motion for Leave to,,, (Snapp, Randall)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #116 defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/4/2016. (ks)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER denying #112 the parties' Joint Motion to Re-Set Trial to Second Week of the October Trial Docket, striking this case from the Court's October 2016 trial docket, and resetting this case on the Court's November 2016 trial docket. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/4/2016. (ks)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting #199 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal and plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Arthur Terry Brix and Exhibits Thereto. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/4/2016. (ks)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial RESET on the November 2016 trial docket (11/1/2016 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. (ks)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MOTION for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Arthur Terry Brix and Exhibits Thereto by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Darrell Harris from Testifying as an Expert by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 SEALED EXHIBIT by Counter Defendants Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #190 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #196 Order on Motion for Leave to, (Watson, Tynia)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 SEALED EXHIBIT by Counter Defendants Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #190 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #196 Order on Motion for Leave to, (Watson, Tynia)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #185 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Presenting Evidence or Argument Regarding Witnesses and Exhibits Not Timely Disclosed (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/30/2016. (ks)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 SEALED RESPONSE by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #177 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, (Talley, Evan)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 SEALED RESPONSE by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #169 Order on Motion for Leave to,, (Talley, Evan)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 OBJECTIONS re #145 Proposed Voir Dire Defendants' Non-Objection to Plaintiffs' Proposed Voir Dire filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 OBJECTIONS re #149 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 OBJECTIONS re #140 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 RESPONSE in Opposition re #146 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Presenting Evidence or Argument Regarding Witnesses and Exhibits not Timely Disclosed filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Emails Produced by Plaintiffs to be sealed upon Court's order (Dkt. No. 185), #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Defendants' First Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatory No. 2, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Forest Dorn Deposition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Khalev's Deposition to be sealed upon Court's order (Dkt. No. 185), #6 Exhibit Excerpts of Forest Dorn 30(b)(6) Deposition)(Watson, Tynia)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SEALED REPLY by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #177 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, #154 Sealed Response, #113 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc (Snapp, Randall)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #177 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, #147 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Watson, Tynia)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #177 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, #156 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Watson, Tynia)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #177 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,, #155 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Watson, Tynia)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Presenting Evidence or Arguement Regarding Witnesses and Exhibits not Timely Disclosed by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 COUNTER DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by All Plaintiffs and Objections to Defendants' Designations of August 4, 2016 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony of Scott Formolo. Related document: #143 Designation of Deposition Testimony filed by Kiva Holding Inc, Igor Khalev.(Watson, Tynia)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 COUNTER DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by All Plaintiffs and Objections to Defendants' Designations of July 28, 2016 30(b)(6) Deposition Testimony of Forest Dorn. Related document: #142 Designation of Deposition Testimony filed by Kiva Holding Inc, Igor Khalev.(Watson, Tynia)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 COUNTER DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by All Plaintiffs and Objections to Defendants' Designations of August 7, 2015 Deposition Testimony of Forest Dorn. Related document: #144 Designation of Deposition Testimony filed by Kiva Holding Inc, Igor Khalev.(Watson, Tynia)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 OBJECTIONS re #141 Proposed Voir Dire of Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 SEALED RESPONSE by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #169 Order on Motion for Leave to,, (Talley, Evan)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SEALED REPLY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #169 Order on Motion for Leave to,, (Talley, Evan)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SEALED REPLY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #169 Order on Motion for Leave to,, (Talley, Evan)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #175 and #176 defendants' Motions for Leave to File Document under Seal and granting #170 , #171 , #172 and #173 plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to File under Seal (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/29/2016. (ks)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Response to Motion in Limine by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Evidence, and for Attorney Fees Relating to Plaintiffs Failure to Supplement Its Response to Defendants Interrogatories by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Mischaracterizing Plaintiffs Trade Secret Claims as Set Forth in the Amended Complaint and in Plaintiffs Discovery Responses with supporting Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan) Modified on 9/29/2016 (Document Stricken; Incorrect document attached) (ks).
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgement by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Witnesses Who Were Not Consulted in Preparation for 30(b)(6) by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony or Evidence at Trial Pertaining to Dr. Khalev's Alleged Sabotage by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs From Presenting Evidence or Testimony at Trial on its Untimely Disclosed Trade Secrets by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #165 , #167 and #168 defendants' Motions for Leave to File Document under Seal (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/28/2016. (ks)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of October 30, 2015 Letter from Defendants Counsel to Plaintiffs Counsel with supporting Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Mischaracterizing Plaintiffs Trade Secret Claims as Set Forth in the Amended Complaint and in Plaintiffs Discovery Responses with supporting Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION for Leave Under Seal Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Defendant Igor Khalev was Excused from Performing Under His Non-Disclosure Agreement and Non-Compete Agreement with Plaintiffs with supporting Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Partial Judgment with supporting Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation: Disregard document #166 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine. THIS IS A DUPLICATE OF DOCUMENT #165 . (pw)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation: Disregard document #164 . Motion to leave to file under seal. Attorney attached the wrong document. (pw)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SEALED RESPONSE by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #160 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,, (Talley, Evan)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #160 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,, (Palmer, Drew)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #160 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,, (Talley, Evan)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #158 and #159 defendants' Motions for Leave to File Document under Seal and granting #157 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Mr. Darrell Harris from Testifying as an Expert and Exhibits Thereto (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/26/2016. (ks)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Arthur Terry Brix and Brief in Support with supporting Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate Trial by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Mr. Darrell Harris from Testifying as an Expert Witness by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Andrew)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #138 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Talley, Evan)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #138 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Talley, Evan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SEALED RESPONSE by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #113 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, #138 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Talley, Evan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #138 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #116 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Snapp, Randall)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of October 30, 2015 Letter by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - October 30, 2015 Letter from Defendants' Counsel)(Henry, Andrew)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #138 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Watson, Tynia)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #114 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, #138 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Snapp, Randall)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Given Jury Instructions used in The Sydco Sys., Inc. v. Glasgow)(Watson, Tynia)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #138 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Palmer, Drew)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #138 Order on Motion for Leave to,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Talley, Evan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Presenting Evidence or Argument Regarding Witnesses and Exhibits not Timely Disclosed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' 26(a) Disclosures)(Talley, Evan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Proposed Voir Dire by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Watson, Tynia)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc of August 7, 2015 Deposition of Forest Dorn. (Talley, Evan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc of 30(b)(6) Deposition of Scott Formolo. (Talley, Evan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc of 30(b)(6) Deposition of Forest Dorn. (Talley, Evan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Proposed Voir Dire by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Proposed Jury Instructions by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 FINAL PRETRIAL REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Witness List, #5 Exhibit Defendants' Witness List)(Watson, Tynia)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #130 , #131 , #132 , #133 defendants' Motions for Leave to File Document under Seal and granting #134 , #135 , #136 , #137 plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to File under Seal (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/22/2016. (ks)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Mischaracterizing Plaintiffs' Trade Secret Claims as Set Forth in the Amended Complaint and in Plaintiffs' Discovery Response by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Defendant Khalev was Excused From Performing Under His Non-Disclosure and Non-Compete Agreement with Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Evidence and for Attorneys Fees by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude the Testimony Regarding Trade Secrets not Timely Disclosed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion in Limine to Preclude Unfairly Prejudicial Testimony by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Motion in Limine to Exclude the Introduction of Trade Secret Claims Where There is No Predicate Evidence of Ownership by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 OBJECTIONS re #115 Exhibit List / Witness List filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 OBJECTIONS re #111 Witness List of Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 OBJECTIONS re #110 Exhibit List of Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew E Henry on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Henry, Andrew)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Exhibit List / Witness List Final Witness List and Supplemental Final Exhibit List by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Watson, Tynia)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Final Witness and Supplemental Final Exhibit List. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/13/2016. (ks)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to file Plaintiffs' Final Witness List and Supplemental Final Exhibit List by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #118 Order on Motion for Leave to (Talley, Evan)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #120 Order on Motion for Leave to, (Snapp, Randall)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #119 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Arthur Terry Brix and Brief in Support and Exhibits Thereto. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/6/2016. (ks)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Arthur Terry Brix and Brief in Support and Exhibits Thereto by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #117 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/6/2016. (ks)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Talley, Evan)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Exhibit List / Witness List by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Watson, Tynia)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Talley, Evan)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 SEALED MOTION by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #106 Order on Motion for Leave to (Snapp, Randall)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 JOINT MOTION for Order Re-Setting Trial to Second Week of October Trial Docket by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Witness List by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Exhibit List by Counter Claimants Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Kiva Holding Inc, Defendants Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/1/2016. (ks)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude Evidence, and for Attorneys Fees Related to Plaintiffs Failure to Supplement its Responses to Defendants Interrogatories with attached Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #104 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/1/2016. (ks)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/1/2016. (ks)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION to Seal Document and Directing the Filing of Redacted Document re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/18/2016. (ks)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time of Deadlines by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ENTRY of Appearance by Drew T Palmer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Palmer, Drew)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 OCTOBER CIVIL TRIAL DOCKET: Docket Call set for 10/5/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. (ks)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 defendants' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel and Ordering that Joseph P. Titterington be withdrawn as counsel for defendants. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/10/2016. (ks)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw Counsel, Joseph P. Titterington by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines, as set forth in the order. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 08/01/16. (jy)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 9/1/2016. (jy)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time of Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #94 the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadlines (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/15/2016. (ks)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying #84 defendants' Motion for Leave to Exceed Limit on Requests for Admission (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/2/2016. (ks)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SEALED REPLY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #89 Sealed Response, #84 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Limit on Requests for Admission and Memorandum in Support (Talley, Evan)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/28/2016. (ks)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Seal Document by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #84 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Limit on Requests for Admission and Memorandum in Support (Watson, Tynia)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 the joint motion for entry of stipulated amended protective order (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/22/2016. (ks)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order (Amended) by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Amended Protective Order)(Talley, Evan)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Documents for Their Response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Exceed Limit on Requests for Admission. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/6/2016. (ks)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents for Their Response to Defs' Mtn for Leave to Exceed Limit on Requests for Admissions by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Limit on Requests for Admission and Memorandum in Support by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deft's Req for Adm., #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter)(Talley, Evan)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/4/2016. (ks)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Seal Document by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 LETTER from Jordan Sigale received March 9, 2016. (ks)
January 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan Sigale on behalf of Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Sigale, Jordan)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 the Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines and continuing case to the October 2016 trial docket (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 1/14/2016. (ks)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial reset on the October 2016 trial docket (10/11/2016 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange; Discovery due by 6/20/2016; Motions due by 8/1/2016; Pretrial Report due by 9/22/2016. (ks)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time of All Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER to #60 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc.(Watson, Tynia)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 (Document Restricted)SEALED DOCUMENT by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc (Watson, Tynia)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 (Document Restricted)SEALED DOCUMENT by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #69 Order on Motion for Leave to (Watson, Tynia)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for GFS Chemical, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GFS Chemical, Inc. Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for W&W Fiberglass Tank, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - W&W Fiberglass Tank, LLC Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for ProTank Southwest, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ProTank Southwest LLC Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for Harrington Industrial Plastics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Harrington Industrial Plastics, Inc.)(Watson, Tynia)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for Spears Manufacturing, Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Spears Manufacturing Company, Inc. Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal Notices of Subpoena to Produce Documents. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/11/2015. (ks)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for Overflow Energy, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Overflow Energy, LLC Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Notices of Subpoena to Produce Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for Univar USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Univar USA, Inc. Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for American Electric Power Service Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - American Electric Power Service Corporation Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for DXP Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DXP Enterprises, Inc. Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for Reagent Chemical and Research, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reagent Chemical and Research, Inc. Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for Fox Chemicals Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fox Chemicals Company Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs for Troy Jones Rental, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Troy Jones Subpoena)(Watson, Tynia)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc by Kiva Holding Inc, Igor Khalev.(Talley, Evan)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 and #58 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Jordan A. Sigale and Julie L. Langdon are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of defendants, provided counsel submit an ECF registration form and file an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/3/2015. (ks)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julie L. Langdon Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2193797 by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Titterington, Joseph)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jordan A. Sigale Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2193764 by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Titterington, Joseph)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENTRY of Appearance by Douglas J Sorocco on behalf of Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Sorocco, Douglas)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Watson, Tynia)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 the parties' Stipulated Motion to Streamline Proceedings (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/30/2015. (ks)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JOINT MOTION for Order to Streamline Proceedings by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint)(Watson, Tynia)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER finding as moot #49 plaintiffs' Motion for an Expedited Ruling and/or Hearing on the Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/5/2015. (ks)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying #40 defendants' Motion for Protective Order or, in the Alternative, for an Order Compelling Plaintiffs to Provide Complete Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/5/2015. (ks)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying #48 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and to File the Sur-Reply and Accompanying Exhibit under Seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/5/2015. (ks)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Expedite Ruling and/or Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Exerpt of KIVA Website)(Watson, Tynia)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Tynia)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SEALED REPLY by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #44 Sealed Response (Talley, Evan)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 defendant's Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal. Defendants may file their Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order and Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel under seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/27/2015. (ks)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Seal Document by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SEALED RESPONSE by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc Re: #41 Sealed Document, #40 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Watson, Tynia)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal its response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for protective order and all accompanying exhibits. Plaintiffs may file under seal their response in opposition to defendants' motion for protective order and accompanying exhibits. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/20/2015. (ks)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Watson, Tynia)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (Document Restricted)SEALED DOCUMENT by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc Re: #40 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Titterington, Joseph)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SEALED MOTION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Titterington, Joseph)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document under Seal. Defendants may file their Motion for Protective Order or, in the Alternative, for an Order Compelling Plaintiffs to Provide Complete Answers to Defendants' Interrogatories, Declaration in Support, and attached exhibits under seal. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/29/2015. (ks)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Seal Defendants Motion for Protective Order or, in the Alternative, for an Order Compelling Plaintiffs to Provide Complete Answers to Defendants Interrogatories, Declaration in Support, and attached Exhibits by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Titterington, Joseph)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Certain of Defendants' Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Watson, Tynia) Modified on 7/28/2015 to reflect this filing is a reply rather than a response. (njr)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 plaintiff's unopposed motion to extend time to file reply in support of plaintiffs' motion to dismiss certain of defendants' counterclaims. Plaintiffs shall file their reply to defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Certain of Defendants Counterclaims on or before July 27, 2015. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/16/2015. (ks)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Certain of Defendants' Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support Thereof by All Plaintiffs. (Hutson, Allen)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Certain of Defendants' Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to #30 plaintiffs' motion to dismiss. Defendants shall file their response to plaintiffs motion to dismiss on or before July 13, 2015. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/25/2015. (ks)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Certain of Defendants' Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support Thereof by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to #21 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc.(Watson, Tynia)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Certain of Defendants' Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support Thereof by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Watson, Tynia)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #28 Motion for Protective Order (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/9/2015. (ks)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order)(Watson, Tynia)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the April 2016 trial docket (4/12/2016 9:00 AM) in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 2/1/2016; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 2/11/2016; Pla witness list due 2/1/2016; Dft witness list due 2/11/2016; Pla exhibit list due 2/1/2016; Dft exhibit list due 2/11/2016; Motions in limine due 3/24/2016; Jury instructions due 3/24/2016; Voir dire requests due 3/24/2016; Trial briefs due 3/24/2016; Discovery due by 3/1/2016. Motions due by 2/1/2016. Pretrial Report due by 3/24/2016. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/4/2015. (ks)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 plaintiffs' unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to defendants' counterclaims. Plaintiffs shall answer or otherwise respond to defendants' counterclaims on or before June 11, 2015. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/28/2015. (ks)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Watson, Tynia)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Counter Defendants Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Resources Inc. (Hutson, Allen)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Tynia A Watson on behalf of Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc (Watson, Tynia)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #15 Plaintiff Iofina, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery and Brief in Support (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/14/2015. (ks)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc by Kiva Holding Inc, Igor Khalev. (Talley, Evan)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc.(Talley, Evan)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery and Brief in Support filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LA Municipal Police v. Contintal Resources Opinion)(Titterington, Joseph)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER finding as moot #14 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Expedited Ruling on the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/27/2015. (ks)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #8 Defendants Igor Khalev and Kiva Holding, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 4/27/2015. (ks)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUNE STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2015 02:30 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 5/26/2015. (ks)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Expedited Discovery and Brief in Support by Iofina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Farhat v. Board ov County Commissioners, #2 Exhibit Interscope Records v. Does, #3 Exhibit Energetics Systems Corp v. Advanced Cerametrics)(Hutson, Allen)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Expedite Ruling on the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Hutson, Allen)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Titterington, Joseph)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Carroll v. Walmart, #2 Exhibit Baca v. Keisler, #3 Exhibit Neon v. McKenzie, #4 Exhibit Corp Express v. BT Office)(Hutson, Allen)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Allen L Hutson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hutson, Allen)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Randall J Snapp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Snapp, Randall)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Compete Agreement, #2 Exhibit Non-Disclosure Agreement, #3 Exhibit Interim Results)(Talley, Evan)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Out of Time re #1 Complaint, on or before 01/20/15. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/29/14. (jy)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph P Titterington on behalf of All Defendants (Titterington, Joseph)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (Talley, Evan)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan W Talley on behalf of Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc (Talley, Evan)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Inc, Iofina Resources Inc in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500043426 regarding #1 Complaint. (njr)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc. (cpp)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Igor Khalev, Kiva Holding Inc filed by Iofina Chemical Inc, Iofina Resources Inc, Iofina Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (njr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iofina Inc et al v. Khalev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iofina Inc
Represented By: Randall J Snapp
Represented By: Allen L Hutson
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Represented By: Drew T Palmer
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iofina Natural Gas Inc
Represented By: Randall J Snapp
Represented By: Allen L Hutson
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Represented By: Drew T Palmer
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iofina Resources Inc
Represented By: Randall J Snapp
Represented By: Allen L Hutson
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Represented By: Drew T Palmer
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iofina Chemical Inc
Represented By: Randall J Snapp
Represented By: Allen L Hutson
Represented By: Andrew E Henry
Represented By: Drew T Palmer
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor Khalev
Represented By: Douglas J Sorocco
Represented By: Evan W Talley
Represented By: Jordan Sigale
Represented By: Joseph P Titterington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiva Holding Inc
Represented By: Douglas J Sorocco
Represented By: Evan W Talley
Represented By: Jordan Sigale
Represented By: Joseph P Titterington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?