Hill v. City of Oklahoma City et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Hill
Defendant: City of Oklahoma City, Jeffery Coffey, Christopher Shubert, Austin Childs, Timothy Owens, Bill Citty and Oklahoma City Police Department
Case Number: 5:2015cv00881
Filed: August 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J. Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Defendants' Motion to Strike Witness and Exhibits. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 11/9/17. (lg)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 9/11/17. (lg)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 37 OKC's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 9/6/17. (lg)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants Coffey, Shubert, Childs, and Owens. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 7/10/17. (lg)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 5/23/17. (lg)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 19 Defendant OCPD's MOTION to Dismiss filed by Oklahoma City Police Department; Oklahoma City Police Department terminated. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 1/28/16. (lg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. City of Oklahoma City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hill
Represented By: Aaron D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oklahoma City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Shubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Citty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?