Prince v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Susan Gail Prince
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 5:2015cv00933
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Charles B Goodwin
Presiding Judge: David L. Russell
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding attorney's fees in the amount of $18,616.50. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/19/2020. (jb)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding attorney's fees under the EAJA in the amount of $6477.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B Goodwin on 03/09/2018. (jb)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER. The decision of the Commissioner is reversed and remanded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B Goodwin on 09/11/2017. (jb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gail Prince
Represented By: Darren Todd Rackley
Represented By: Gayle L Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?