Autry et al v. Cleveland County Sheriff's Department et al

Plaintiff: Robert Allen Autry and Sandra Valentine
Defendant: Cleveland County Sheriff's Department, Oklahoma Indigent Defense System, EMSA, Cleveland County of, Unknown and John Doe
Case Number: 5:2015cv01167
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/28/2018. (mb)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 137 Defendant Marshall L. Rea, D.O.'s Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs' action against Defendant Marshall L. Rea D.O. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/17/2018. (mb)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 133 Defendant Deanna Wheeler's Motion for Sanctions. Deanna Wheeler is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/31/2018. (mb)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 125 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff's action against Defendants Cindy Bilyeu, Raven Funez, and Delores Brown is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/13/2018. (mb)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 122 Defendant Deanna Wheeler's Motion to Compel to Compel Discovery Responses and Request for Attorney's Fees. Plaintiff shall serve full and complete answers to Wheeler's First Set of Interrogatories and complete responses to First Request for Production of Document within 14 days. Defendant Wheeler shall recover reasonable costs and fees incurred upon separate application filed within 14 days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/17/2018. (mb)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 69 Defendant Norman Regional Hospital Authority d/b/a Norman Regional Hospital's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 79 Defendant Marshall L. Rea D.O.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/12/2018. (mb)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/5/2018. (mb)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Joseph Lester, as Sheriff of Cleveland County. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/15/2017. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autry et al v. Cleveland County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Allen Autry
Represented By: Brian A Buswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Valentine
Represented By: Brian A Buswell
Represented By: Brian A Buswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Indigent Defense System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?