Christ Center of Divine Philosophy Inc v. Elam

Plaintiff: Christ Center of Divine Philosophy Inc
Defendant: Ellen Veronica Elam
Case Number: 5:2016cv00065
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 34 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration on Changes in Injunctive Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/12/2018. (mb)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Christ Center of Divine Philosophy Inc against Ellen Veronica Elam. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/18/2017. (mb)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/21/2017. (mb)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/10/17. (ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christ Center of Divine Philosophy Inc v. Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christ Center of Divine Philosophy Inc
Represented By: Martin G Ozinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Veronica Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?