Zon LED LLC v. Power Partners Inc et al
Plaintiff: Zon LED LLC
Defendant: Power Partners Inc, Inventronics Inc and Inventronics USA Inc
Case Number: 5:2016cv01090
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 46 Defendant Inventronics USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/17/2017. (mb)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 43 Power Partners, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/19/2017. (mb)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying as moot 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss; denying 30 Motion to Dismiss; denying 31 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/31/17. (ml)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Pleading within 14 days re 1 Complaint, filed by Zon LED LLC. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/12/2017. (mb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zon LED LLC v. Power Partners Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zon LED LLC
Represented By: Kerry D Green
Represented By: Edward L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Partners Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inventronics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inventronics USA Inc
Represented By: Joe E Edwards
Represented By: Emilie B Wedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?