Ouandji v. Hedglen et al
Plaintiff: Steven Adrien Ouandji
Defendant: Vincent Hedglen and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 5:2016cv01303
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J. Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. A separate judgment will issue. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 5/21/18. (rmc)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 49 United States Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 05/02/18. (wh)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying without prejudice 33 Plaintiff's Daubert Motion. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 04/05/18. (wh)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER striking 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 11/17/17. (lg)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 3/30/17. (lg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ouandji v. Hedglen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Adrien Ouandji
Represented By: Mark B Houts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Hedglen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?