Andrews v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Andrews and Lance Andrews
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv01359
Filed: November 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Kingfisher
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal , Joint by Lance Andrews. (Landes, Christopher)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Daniel Aizenman, Esq., leave to withdraw as counsel for defendant...the clerk is directed to strike Mr. Aizenman's name as counsel of record for defendant. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/25/2017. (lam)
September 21, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Daniel Aizenman by Ford Motor Company. (Aizenman, Daniel)
September 15, 2017 Filing 29 Witness List by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
September 6, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- FMC's RFAs to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit 3-Facebook page, #4 Exhibit 4-Bready Report, #5 Exhibit 5-Ram K Report, #6 Exhibit 6-Ruminer v GM)(Richardson, Andrew)
September 1, 2017 Filing 27 Expert Witness List Rule 26 Expert Witness Disclosure by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying defendant's #23 motion to reconsider...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 7/31/2017. (cla)
July 27, 2017 Filing 25 REPLY in Support re #23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew) Modified on 7/28/2017 to correct event type (cla).
July 20, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Lance Andrews. (Landes, Christopher)
June 30, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Bristol-Myers)(Richardson, Andrew)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 12/15/2017; Jury instructions due 12/15/2017; Voir dire requests due 12/15/2017; Trial briefs due 12/15/2017; Discovery due by 10/1/2017. Jury Trial set on the court's 01/2018 trial docket in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Joe Heaton. Motions due by 10/15/2017. Pretrial Report due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 5/3/2017. (cla)
April 24, 2017 Filing 21 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
April 6, 2017 Filing 20 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 05/03/2017 @ 09:50 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Status Report due by 4/24/2017. (cla)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #14 defendant's motion for leave to appeal...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 03/14/2017. (lam)
March 10, 2017 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appeal for Certification under 28 USC Sec. 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal or in the Alternative, to Reconsider and Opening Brief in Support filed by Lance Andrews. (Landes, Christopher)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of deadline #16 ; plaintiff shall file his response to defendant's motion for leave to appeal #14 not later than 03/10/2017. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 3/6/2017. (cla)
March 3, 2017 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appeal for Certification under 28 USC Sec. 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal or in the Alternative, to Reconsider and Opening Brief in Support by Lance Andrews. (Landes, Christopher)
February 15, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Subpoena by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Subpoena)(Aizenman, Daniel)
February 10, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appeal for Certification under 28 USC Sec. 1292(b) and to Stay Proceedings Pending Interlocutory Appeal or in the Alternative, to Reconsider and Opening Brief in Support by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
February 9, 2017 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel N Aizenman on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Aizenman, Daniel)
February 9, 2017 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company.(Richardson, Andrew)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying defendant's motion to dismiss #8 because Andrews has made the necessary prima facie showing of a sufficient basis for the exercise of personal jurisdiction over Ford Motor Company...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 1/26/2017. (cla)
January 2, 2017 Filing 10 REPLY in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew) Modified on 1/3/2017 to correct event type (cla).
December 27, 2016 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support filed by Lance Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tarver v. Ford Motor Co. & TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, #2 Exhibit Ford Dealership List, #3 Exhibit OSCN List of Ford Cases, #4 Exhibit 2015 Ford Annual Report (excerpts))(Landes, Christopher)
December 6, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Michael DeYoung, #2 Exhibit 2-Oversen v Kelle Transport, #3 Exhibit Erwin v FMC)(Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
December 5, 2016 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by James G Devinney on behalf of Lance Andrews (Devinney, James)
December 5, 2016 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher W Landes on behalf of Lance Andrews (Landes, Christopher)
December 2, 2016 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for plaintiff to file an entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 12/05/2016. Entered at the direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/2/2016. (cla)
November 29, 2016 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Smith on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Smith, Michael)
November 29, 2016 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew L Richardson on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
November 29, 2016 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Quinn-Cooper on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
November 29, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Logan County, case number CJ-2016-204 filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition Served on FMC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons to FMC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Copy of Summons to FMC, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla)
November 29, 2016 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2398472. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Andrew L Richardson
Represented By: Mary Quinn-Cooper
Represented By: Michael F Smith
Represented By: Daniel N Aizenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Andrews
Represented By: Christopher W Landes
Represented By: James G Devinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?