Gore v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Gore and Tracy Gore
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 5:2017cv00176
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTS the Joint Motion to Extend Administrative Closing Order Deadline #33 and EXTENDS the Administrative Closing Order deadline to October 5, 2018.. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/1/2018. (ac)
July 31, 2018 Filing 33 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Extend Administrative Closing Order Deadline by Tracy Gore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tracy, E)
July 6, 2018 Filing 32 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/6/2018. (ks)
June 14, 2018 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by Wendell P Martens, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Martens, Wendell)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Wendell P. Martens, Jr. is admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of plaintiff, provided counsel submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/5/2018. (ks)
June 5, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2713633 by Tracy Gore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gallagher, William)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 the joint motion for extension of deadlines and continuance of trial setting and continuing case to the February 2019 trial docket (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/2/2018. (ks)
May 2, 2018 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Trial RESET on the February 2019 trial docket (2/12/2019 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Discovery due by 1/2/2019. Motions due by 12/3/2018. Pretrial Report due by 1/24/2019. (ks)
May 1, 2018 Filing 27 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Deadlines and Continuance of Trial Setting by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Richardson, Andrew)
April 26, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Subpoena by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Subpoena Duces tecum)(Richardson, Andrew)
December 15, 2017 Filing 25 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Defendant shall file its Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/15/2017. (ks)
December 14, 2017 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Ford's Amended Answer to P's Petition & Affirmative Defenses)(Richardson, Andrew)
August 9, 2017 Filing 22 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #21 Motion for Protective Order (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/9/2017. (ks)
August 7, 2017 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order by Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
July 31, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE (other) by Ford Motor Company of Serving Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Richardson, Andrew)
July 28, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE (other) by Tracy Gore Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures (Matthews, Stewart)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the August 2018 trial docket (8/14/2018 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange; Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 6/1/2018; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 6/11/2018; Pla witness list due 6/1/2018; Dft witness list due 6/11/2018; Pla exhibit list due 6/1/2018; Dft exhibit list due 6/11/2018; Motions in limine due 7/26/2018; Jury instructions due 7/26/2018; Voir dire requests due 7/26/2018; Trial briefs due 7/26/2018; Discovery due by 7/1/2018. Motions due by 6/1/2018. Pretrial Report due by 7/26/2018. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/6/2017. (ks)
June 27, 2017 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Richardson, Andrew)
May 11, 2017 Filing 16 JULY STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 7/6/2017 03:00 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 6/27/2017. (ks)
May 3, 2017 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Anna C Lukeman on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Lukeman, Anna)
May 3, 2017 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Quinn-Cooper on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Quinn-Cooper, Mary)
May 3, 2017 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ford Motor Company . (Richardson, Andrew)
May 3, 2017 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Richardson, Andrew)
May 3, 2017 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew L Richardson on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew)
March 29, 2017 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Stewart D Matthews on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Matthews, Stewart)
March 29, 2017 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew G Counts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Counts, Andrew)
March 29, 2017 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by E Todd Tracy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tracy, E)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 , #5 , and #6 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; E. Todd Tracy, Stewart D. Matthews, and Andrew G. Counts are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of plaintiff, provided counsel each submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 3/29/2017. (ks)
March 28, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2462973 by Tracy Gore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gallagher, William)
March 28, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2462969 by Tracy Gore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gallagher, William)
March 28, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2462955 by Tracy Gore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gallagher, William)
March 24, 2017 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by William S Gallagher on behalf of Tracy Gore (Gallagher, William)
March 24, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ford Motor Company. (pw)
February 23, 2017 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2443450. (Gallagher, William)
February 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company filed by Tracy Gore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gore v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Andrew L Richardson
Represented By: Anna C Proctor
Represented By: Mary Quinn-Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Gore
Represented By: William S Gallagher
Represented By: Andrew G Counts
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Stewart D Matthews
Represented By: Wendell P Martens, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?