Powell et al v. Correctional Healthcare Management Inc et al
Plaintiff: Heather Powell
Defendant: Correctional Healthcare Management Inc and Armor Correctional Health Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00690
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER striking #10 First Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/5/2018. (ml)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 STRICKEN: FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Delluomo, Daniel) See Doc. No. #11 on 9/5/2018 (ml).
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE...this case is reassigned to Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti for all further proceedings. Honorable Joe Heaton no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 8/15/2018. (cla)
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel M Delluomo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Delluomo, Daniel)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Armor Correctional Health Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint in Fisher, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss in Fisher)(Winter, Anthony)
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Heather Powell(as Mother, Next Friend and Guardian of Elizabeth Kiley Eaton). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Petition)(Delluomo, Daniel)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for plaintiff to file an entry of appearance in accordance with LCvR83.4 not later than 07/26/2018. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/25/2018. (lam)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Armor Correctional Health Services Inc. (Winter, Anthony)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony C Winter on behalf of Armor Correctional Health Services Inc (Winter, Anthony)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Armor Correctional Health Services Inc. (Winter, Anthony)
July 17, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2738923. (Winter, Anthony)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-3476 filed by Armor Correctional Health Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons, #3 Exhibit 3-Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell et al v. Correctional Healthcare Management Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Healthcare Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Correctional Health Services Inc
Represented By: Sean P Snider
Represented By: Anthony C Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Powell
Represented By: Daniel M Delluomo
Represented By: Steven W Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?