HLR Oil & Gas LLC v. Gaedeke Holdings VII, Ltd et al

Plaintiff: HLR Oil & Gas LLC
Defendant: Gaedeke Holdings VII, Ltd, Gaedeke Oil & Gas Operating LLC and Gaedeke Holdings VII LTD
Case Number: 5:2018cv00692
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/7/2018. (mb)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Albert, John)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by HLR Oil & Gas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Disclosure Identifying Citizenship of all Members of HLR Oil & Gas, LLC)(Peters, James)
July 19, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Albert, John)
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Gaedeke Oil & Gas Operating LLC . (Albert, John)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Gaedeke Holdings VII, Ltd . (Albert, John)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by John P Albert on behalf of All Defendants (Albert, John)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Travis P Brown on behalf of All Defendants (Brown, Travis)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory L Mahaffey on behalf of All Defendants (Mahaffey, Gregory)
July 18, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2739775. (Albert, John)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grady County, case number CV-2018-119 filed by Gaedeke Holdings VII, Ltd, Gaedeke Oil & Gas Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons-Gaedeke Holdings, #3 Exhibit 3-Summons-Gaedeke Oil & Gas, #4 Exhibit 4-Grady County Docket, #5 Exhibit 5-Corporate Record-Gaedeke Holdings, #6 Exhibit 6-Corporate Record-Gaedeke Oil & Gas, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HLR Oil & Gas LLC v. Gaedeke Holdings VII, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaedeke Holdings VII, Ltd
Represented By: Travis P Brown
Represented By: John P Albert
Represented By: Gregory L Mahaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaedeke Oil & Gas Operating LLC
Represented By: Travis P Brown
Represented By: John P Albert
Represented By: Gregory L Mahaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaedeke Holdings VII LTD
Represented By: Travis P Brown
Represented By: John P Albert
Represented By: Gregory L Mahaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HLR Oil & Gas LLC
Represented By: James M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?