Hightower v. Frito-Lay Inc et al
Plaintiff: Norman L Hightower
Defendant: Pepsico Inc and Frito-Lay Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00727
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Norman L Hightower. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Norman Hightower, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter PepsiCo Sedgwick 8-27-15)(Snyder, Riki)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit EXH. A -- Decl. Moore, #3 Exhibit EXH. B -- Unpub. Cases)(Cowley, Raymond)
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by Norman L Hightower. (Snyder, Riki)
August 2, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond A Cowley on behalf of Frito-Lay Inc, Pepsico Inc (Cowley, Raymond)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/1/2018. (md)
August 1, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2747016 by Frito-Lay Inc, Pepsico Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Snapp, Randall)
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Pepsico Inc.(Snapp, Randall)
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Frito-Lay Inc.(Snapp, Randall)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Melissa R McDuffey on behalf of Frito-Lay Inc, Pepsico Inc (McDuffey, Melissa)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Randall J Snapp on behalf of Frito-Lay Inc, Pepsico Inc (Snapp, Randall)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Riki R Snyder on behalf of Norman L Hightower (Snyder, Riki)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frito-Lay Inc, Pepsico Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, (Hutson, Allen)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Frito-Lay Inc . (Hutson, Allen)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Pepsico Inc . (Hutson, Allen)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Allen L Hutson on behalf of Frito-Lay Inc, Pepsico Inc (Hutson, Allen)
July 30, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2745312. (Hutson, Allen)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2017-7343 filed by Frito-Lay Inc, Pepsico Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Petition, #2 Exhibit B-Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Summons Returned, #5 Exhibit E-Declaration of Brandyn Brown, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hightower v. Frito-Lay Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman L Hightower
Represented By: Riki R Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsico Inc
Represented By: Allen L Hutson
Represented By: Melissa R McDuffey
Represented By: Raymond A Cowley
Represented By: Randall J Snapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay Inc
Represented By: Allen L Hutson
Represented By: Melissa R McDuffey
Represented By: Raymond A Cowley
Represented By: Randall J Snapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?