Hensel Phelps Construction Co v. Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc
Plaintiff: Hensel Phelps Construction Co
Defendant: Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00729
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc. (Willis, W)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case citation)(Hill, Theresa)
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Theresa Noble Hill on behalf of Hensel Phelps Construction Co (Hill, Theresa)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D Goss on behalf of Hensel Phelps Construction Co (Goss, Michael)
August 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Loos v. St.-Gobain Abrasives, #2 Exhibit 2: Chesapeake Appalachia v. Cameron Intern Corp)(Treas, Haylie)
August 1, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Removal. (Treas, Haylie)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by W Brett Willis on behalf of Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc (Willis, W)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Laura L Eakens on behalf of Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc (Eakens, Laura)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derrick Teague on behalf of Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc (Teague, J)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Haylie D Treas on behalf of Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc (Treas, Haylie)
July 30, 2018 Docket Annotation: Doc. #2 & #3 will be refiled with the correct case information. (kr)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by J Derrick Teague on behalf of Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc (Teague, J)DISREGARDED by Notice filed 7/30/18. Modified on 7/30/2018 (kr).
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Haylie D Treas on behalf of Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc (Treas, Haylie) DISREGARDED BY Notice filed 7/30/18. Modified on 7/30/2018 (kr).
July 30, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2745431. (Teague, J)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-2648 filed by Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - Hensel Phelps Corp Entity Details, State of DE, #6 Exhibit 6 - Printout from Hensel Phelps Website, #7 Exhibit 7 - Henel Phelps Parent 1 Corp Entity Details, State of DE, #8 Exhibit 8 - Hensel Phelps Parent 2 Corp Entity Details, State of DE, #9 Exhibit 9 - SS&A Corp Entity Details, State of AL, #10 Exhibit 10 - Printout from SS&A Website, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensel Phelps Construction Co v. Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherlock Smith and Adams Inc
Represented By: W Brett Willis
Represented By: J Derrick Teague
Represented By: Laura L Eakens
Represented By: Haylie D Treas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hensel Phelps Construction Co
Represented By: Theresa Noble Hill
Represented By: Michael D Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?