Gandy v. Bullet Energy Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rick Gandy
Defendant: Bullet Energy Services LLC, Casey Hays and Christopher Hays
Case Number: 5:2018cv00732
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Reissued Electronically - Alias as to Defendants Bullet Energy Services LLC, Casey Hays, Christopher Hays. (ml)
September 16, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Travis M Hedgpeth on behalf of Rick Gandy (Hedgpeth, Travis)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Travis M. Hedgpeth. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/11/2018. (mb)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2769385 by Rick Gandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Horton, Steven)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/5/2018. (ml)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven T Horton on behalf of Rick Gandy (Horton, Steven)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Order Substituting Counsel of Record by Rick Gandy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parmet, Matthew)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/2/2018. (mb)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bullet Energy Services LLC, Casey Hays, Christopher Hays. (rmc)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel by Rick Gandy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parmet, Matthew)
July 31, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2746144. (Parmet, Matthew)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bullet Energy Services LLC, Casey Hays, Christopher Hays filed by Rick Gandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Consent to Join Wage Claim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gandy v. Bullet Energy Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullet Energy Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Gandy
Represented By: Matthew S Parmet
Represented By: Travis M Hedgpeth
Represented By: Steven T Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?