Bohlman v. Terex Corporation

Plaintiff: Dean Bohlman
Defendant: Terex Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv00748
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Amer. w/Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 10/22/2018. (jw)
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Terex Corporation.(Baker, J)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Terex Corporation answer due 9/20/2018.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/30/18. (jw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Terex Corporation . (Baker, J)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Further Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Terex Corporation. (Baker, J)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Cary E Hiltgen on behalf of Terex Corporation (Hiltgen, Cary)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by J R Baker on behalf of Terex Corporation (Baker, J)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Barrett T Bowers on behalf of Dean Bohlman (Bowers, Barrett)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan M Irwin on behalf of Dean Bohlman (Irwin, Jonathan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Woodrow K Glass on behalf of Dean Bohlman (Glass, Woodrow)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Bohlman. Terex Corporation served on 8/10/2018. (Glass, Woodrow)
August 8, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2750630. (Glass, Woodrow)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Terex Corporation. (nv)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terex Corporation filed by Dean Bohlman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohlman v. Terex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex Corporation
Represented By: Cary E Hiltgen
Represented By: J R Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Bohlman
Represented By: Woodrow K Glass
Represented By: Jonathan M Irwin
Represented By: Barrett T Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?