Kilburn et al v. Concentra Inc
Plaintiff: Chelsea Kilburn
Defendant: Concentra Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00757
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Concentra Inc filed by Chelsea Kilburn(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Quiles, Alan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE (other) by Chelsea Kilburn(individually) Of Filing Consent to Join (Quiles, Alan)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by John B Brown on behalf of Concentra Inc (Brown, John)
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Concentra Inc. (Albert, Victor)
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Alan L Quiles on behalf of Chelsea Kilburn(on behalf of others similarly situated) (Quiles, Alan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregg I Shavitz on behalf of Chelsea Kilburn(on behalf of others similarly situated) (Shavitz, Gregg)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alan Luis Quiles. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 18-757. (mb)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregg I. Shavitz. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/10/2018. (mb)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Collective Action Complaint. Concentra Inc answer due 9/18/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/5/2018. (ml)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Brown. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/5/2018. (ml)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Concentra Inc. (Albert, Victor)
August 31, 2018 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Concentra Inc . (Albert, Victor)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Brown Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2764213 by Concentra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice for John Brown)(Albert, Victor)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Victor F Albert on behalf of Concentra Inc (Albert, Victor)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin P Grose on behalf of Concentra Inc (Grose, Justin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2759517 by Chelsea Kilburn(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Jorgenson, J)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2759504 by Chelsea Kilburn(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Pro Hac Admission)(Jorgenson, J)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by J David Jorgenson on behalf of Chelsea Kilburn(on behalf of others similarly situated) (Jorgenson, J)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark A Waller on behalf of Chelsea Kilburn(on behalf of others similarly situated) (Waller, Mark)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark A Waller on behalf of Chelsea Kilburn(on behalf of others similarly situated) (Waller, Mark)
August 8, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2750908. (Waller, Mark)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Concentra Inc. (ml)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Concentra Inc filed by Chelsea Kilburn(individually), Chelsea Kilburn(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilburn et al v. Concentra Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Kilburn
Represented By: J David Jorgenson
Represented By: Mark A Waller
Represented By: Gregg I Shavitz
Represented By: Alan L Quiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentra Inc
Represented By: Victor F Albert
Represented By: Justin P Grose
Represented By: John B Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?