Meffley et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Paz Meffley and Jason Meffley
Defendant: Ajay Bhargava, Reynolds Army Community Hospital, Erik Paulson, Southwestern Medical Center LLC, United States of America, Debra Silkes, Nathan D Elfrink and Chukwukadibia J Odunukwe
Case Number: 5:2018cv00788
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Comanche
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Meffley, Paz Meffley. Erik Paulson served on 8/31/2018. (Roberson, Cody)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Meffley, Paz Meffley. Reynolds Army Community Hospital served on 8/20/2018. (Roberson, Cody)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs. United States of America served on 9/24/2018. (Roberson, Cody)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Service by Publication to Defendant Debra Silkes, M.D. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cody J. Roberson - Due Diligence)(Roberson, Cody)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America and U.S. Attorney General (em)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ajay Bhargava.(Thompson, Daniel)
September 11, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J Thompson on behalf of Ajay Bhargava (Thompson, Daniel)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Lane O Krieger on behalf of Ajay Bhargava (Krieger, Lane)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Southwestern Medical Center LLC . (Hall, Elizabeth)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Chukwukadibia J Odunukwe.(Hall, Elizabeth)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Southwestern Medical Center LLC.(Hall, Elizabeth)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth K Hall on behalf of Chukwukadibia J Odunukwe, Southwestern Medical Center LLC (Hall, Elizabeth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by L Ray Maples, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Maples, L)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Cody J Roberson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roberson, Cody)
August 17, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2756137. (Roberson, Cody)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ajay Bhargava, Nathan D Elfrink, Chukwukadibia J Odunukwe, Erik Paulson, Reynolds Army Community Hospital, Debra Silkes, Southwestern Medical Center LLC, United States of America. (nv)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ajay Bhargava, Nathan D Elfrink, Chukwukadibia J Odunukwe, Erik Paulson, Reynolds Army Community Hospital, Debra Silkes, Southwestern Medical Center LLC, and United States of America filed by Jason Meffley and Paz Meffley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meffley et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajay Bhargava
Represented By: Lane O Krieger
Represented By: Daniel J Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds Army Community Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Medical Center LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth K Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Silkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan D Elfrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chukwukadibia J Odunukwe
Represented By: Elizabeth K Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paz Meffley
Represented By: Cody J Roberson
Represented By: L Ray Maples, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Meffley
Represented By: Cody J Roberson
Represented By: L Ray Maples, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?