United States of America v. Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00830
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Referring Judge: Lee R West
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 10:45 AM in Room 1305 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 12/3/2018. (jb)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC.(Pappy, Shiny)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Shiny R Pappy on behalf of Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC (Pappy, Shiny)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC served on 9/13/2018. (Hines, Erin)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Charles Goodwin for all further proceedings. Honorable Lee R. West no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Lee R. West on 9/7/2018. (kb)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC. (ml)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harimau Oil and Gas Consulting LLC
Represented By: Shiny R Pappy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Erin R Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?