Hampton et al v. Peopleready INC et al

Plaintiff: Sterling Hampton
Defendant: Peopleready INC and TrueBlue Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00844
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendants Peopleready INC, TrueBlue Inc. Peopleready INC waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018; TrueBlue Inc waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Vagnini, James)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander M White on behalf of Sterling Hampton(Individually), Sterling Hampton(On behalf of all others similarly situated) (White, Alexander)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert R Barravecchio on behalf of Sterling Hampton(Individually), Sterling Hampton(On behalf of all others similarly situated) (Barravecchio, Robert)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by James A Vagnini on behalf of Sterling Hampton(Individually), Sterling Hampton(On behalf of all others similarly situated) (Vagnini, James)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the motions for admission pro hac vice #3 , #4 and #5 of Robert R. Barravecchio, Esq., James A. Vagnini, Esq., and Alexander M. White, Esq., conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicants within 7 days from entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 9/25/2018. (cla)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexander M White Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2777999 by Sterling Hampton(Individually). (Gusman, Rachel) Modified on 9/24/2018 to correct docket text to reflect the appropriate attorney (nv).
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James A. Vagnini Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2777996 by Sterling Hampton(Individually). (Gusman, Rachel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert R. Barravecchio Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2777991 by Sterling Hampton(Individually). (Gusman, Rachel)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel E Gusman on behalf of Sterling Hampton(Individually) (Gusman, Rachel)
August 31, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2763898. (Gusman, Rachel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peopleready INC, TrueBlue Inc filed by Sterling Hampton(Individually), Sterling Hampton(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton et al v. Peopleready INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peopleready INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrueBlue Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling Hampton
Represented By: Rachel E Gusman
Represented By: James A Vagnini
Represented By: Alexander M White
Represented By: Robert R Barravecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?