Heath v. Standard Insurance Company The
Plaintiff: Tim Heath
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company The
Case Number: 5:2018cv00845
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AFFIRMING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 10/02/18. (wh)
September 18, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2775324. (Mitzner, Miles)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tim Heath. It is recommended that Plaintiff's application be denied. It is further recommended that if Plaintiff does not pay the $400.00 filing fee in full to the Clerk of the Court within twenty-one days of any order adopting this Report and Recommendation, that this action be dismissed without prejudice to refiling. Objections to R&R due by 9/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 8/31/18. (lb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tim Heath. (em)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company The filed by Tim Heath. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heath v. Standard Insurance Company The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Heath
Represented By: Miles L Mitzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?