Perez v. La Sala De Chelino's Inc
Plaintiff: Teresa Perez
Defendant: La Sala De Chelino's Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00891
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Teresa Perez. (Roper, Leah)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 DECEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 03:20 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 11/20/2018. (ks)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by La Sala De Chelino's Inc . (Bowersox, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by La Sala De Chelino's Inc.(Bowersox, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Leah M Roper on behalf of Teresa Perez (Roper, Leah)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Teresa Perez. (Addison, D)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by D Colby Addison on behalf of Teresa Perez (Addison, D)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Tony G Puckett on behalf of La Sala De Chelino's Inc (Puckett, Tony)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth D Bowersox on behalf of La Sala De Chelino's Inc (Bowersox, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2770796. (Bowersox, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-4473 filed by La Sala De Chelino's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA Roper, #4 Exhibit 4 - EOA Addison, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. La Sala De Chelino's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Perez
Represented By: D Colby Addison
Represented By: Leah M Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Sala De Chelino's Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth D Bowersox
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?