Quill Ink Books Limited et al v. ABCD Graphics and Design Inc et al

Plaintiff: Zoey Ellis and Quill Ink Books Limited
Defendant: Jane Doe, ABCD Graphics and Design Inc, John Doe, Addison Cain and Rachelle Soto
Case Number: 5:2018cv00920
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2019 01:20 PM before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 12/20/2018. (jb)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Blushing Books shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint no later than November 26, 2018. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/09/2018. (jb)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Rebecca L Briggs on behalf of ABCD Graphics and Design Inc (Briggs, Rebecca)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond by ABCD Graphics and Design Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Briggs, Rebecca)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rachelle Soto answer due 11/26/2018. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/08/2018. (jb)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Deric J McClellan on behalf of Rachelle Soto (McClellan, Deric)
November 6, 2018 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint,,, by Rachelle Soto. (Dellegar, Shawn)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Shawn M Dellegar on behalf of Rachelle Soto (Dellegar, Shawn)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Dylan D Erwin on behalf of Quill Ink Books Limited (Erwin, Dylan)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Gideon A Lincecum on behalf of Quill Ink Books Limited (Lincecum, Gideon)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to ABCD Graphics and Design Inc, Rachelle Soto. (kmt)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Quill Ink Books Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Blushing Information, #2 Exhibit 2-Trademark Dismissal, #3 Exhibit 3-Take Down Notice dated 4-19-18, #4 Exhibit 4-Additional Take Down Notice, #5 Exhibit 5-Vendor Communications, #6 Exhibit 6-Counter-Notices dated 5-14_16-18, #7 Exhibit 7-Draft2Digital Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 8-Cain Review Manipulation, #9 Exhibit 9-Cain's Online Posts targeting Ellis, #10 Exhibit 10-Amazon Guidelines, #11 Exhibit 11-Disparaging Posts, #12 Exhibit 12-Review Manipulation, #13 Exhibit 13-Kristina Busse Ph D Analysis, #14 Exhibit 14-Blushing Emails, #15 Exhibit 15-Cease and Desist Letter, #16 Exhibit 16-Cain's Dragon Maiden Post)(Lincecum, Gideon)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave. If Plaintiffs choose to pursue the prosecution of this lawsuit, Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint that fully complies with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 10(a) and 17(a) within ten days of the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 10/11/2018. (jb)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym by All Plaintiffs. (Lincecum, Gideon)
September 19, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2776073. (Lincecum, Gideon)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE (other): AO-121 form mailed to Copyright Office. (kmt)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to ABCD Graphics and Design Inc. (kmt)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABCD Graphics and Design Inc, Addison Cain, Jane Doe, John Doe filed by Quill Ink Books Limited, Zoey Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Blushing Information, #2 Exhibit 2-Trademark Dismissal, #3 Exhibit 3-Take Down Notice dated 4-19-18, #4 Exhibit 4-Additional Take Down Notice, #5 Exhibit 5-Vendor Communications, #6 Exhibit 6-Counter-Notices dated 5-14_16-18, #7 Exhibit 7-Draft2Digital Correspondence, #8 Exhibit 8-Cain Review Manipulation, #9 Exhibit 9-Cain's Online Posts targeting Ellis, #10 Exhibit 10-Amazon Guidelines, #11 Exhibit 11-Disparaging Posts, #12 Exhibit 12-Review Manipulation, #13 Exhibit 13-Kristina Busse Ph D Analysis, #14 Exhibit 14-Blushing Emails, #15 Exhibit 15-Cease and Desist Letter, #16 Exhibit 16-Cain's Dragon Maiden Post, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quill Ink Books Limited et al v. ABCD Graphics and Design Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABCD Graphics and Design Inc
Represented By: Rebecca L Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachelle Soto
Represented By: Deric J McClellan
Represented By: Shawn M Dellegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoey Ellis
Represented By: Dylan D Erwin
Represented By: Gideon A Lincecum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quill Ink Books Limited
Represented By: Dylan D Erwin
Represented By: Gideon A Lincecum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?