American Autowash LLC et al v. Virginia College LLC et al
Plaintiff: Foam Zone LLC, American Autowash Express LLC and American Autowash LLC
Defendant: Virginia College LLC and Education Corporation of America
Case Number: 5:2018cv00983
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE (other) by Virginia College LLC of Injuntive Relief in Another District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Receivership Order)(White, Jace)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 defendant Education Corporation of America's unopposed third motion for extension of time...defendant shall answer or otherwise plead within 5 days from the termination of the referenced injunction. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/14/2018. (lam)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Third) by Education Corporation of America, Virginia College LLC. (White, Jace)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Third) by Education Corporation of America, Virginia College LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2-Emergency Motion, #3 Exhibit 3-Injunction dated 11-7-18)(White, Jace)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 defendants' second unopposed motion for extension of deadline...defendants shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings to plaintiffs' complaint not later than 11/09/2018. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/07/2018. (lam)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Education Corporation of America, Virginia College LLC. (Bickle, Brandon)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE (other) by Virginia College LLC of Temporary Injunctive Relief in Another District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Temporary Injunction)(White, Jace)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting defendants' #8 unopposed motion for extension of time; defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiffs' complaint not later than 11/5/2018. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/22/2018. (cla)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Petition by Education Corporation of America, Virginia College LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Order)(White, Jace)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings.. At the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 10/9/18. (jw)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable David L. Russell recused.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/9/18. (jw)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Education Corporation of America . (White, Jace)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Virginia College LLC . (White, Jace)
October 8, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon C Bickle on behalf of Virginia College LLC (Bickle, Brandon)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jace T White on behalf of Education Corporation of America, Virginia College LLC (White, Jace)
October 5, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2787236. (White, Jace)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2018-5351 filed by Virginia College LLC, Education Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01-Docket CJ-18-5351, #2 Exhibit 02-EOA, #3 Exhibit 03-Petition, #4 Exhibit 04-Declaration of Swartzwelder, #5 Exhibit 05-Declaration of Hill, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Autowash LLC et al v. Virginia College LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foam Zone LLC
Represented By: Curtis J Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Autowash Express LLC
Represented By: Curtis J Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Autowash LLC
Represented By: Curtis J Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia College LLC
Represented By: Jace T White
Represented By: Brandon C Bickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Education Corporation of America
Represented By: Jace T White
Represented By: Brandon C Bickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?