Miller Mendel Inc et al v. Oklahoma City City of
Plaintiff: Miller Mendel Inc and Tyler Miller
Defendant: Oklahoma City City of
Case Number: 5:2018cv00990
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Oklahoma City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 188' Patent, #2 Exhibit 12/26/17 USPTO Communication, #3 Exhibit 4/26/18 USPTO Communication, #4 Exhibit Notice of Allowability)(Sorocco, Douglas)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange no longer assigned to case. (fully set out in order) By direction of Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/20/2018. (sr)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 the defendant City of Oklahoma City's unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' Complaint on or before November 30, 2018. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/2/2018. (ks)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan W Talley on behalf of Oklahoma City City of (Talley, Evan)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or otherwise respond by Oklahoma City City of. (Sorocco, Douglas)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Douglas J Sorocco on behalf of Oklahoma City City of (Sorocco, Douglas)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Kurt M Rylander on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rylander, Kurt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miller Mendel Inc, Tyler Miller. Oklahoma City City of served on 10/10/2018. (Nelson, Todd)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Kurt M. Rylander is admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of plaintiffs, provided counsel submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/11/2018. (ks)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul E Rossler on behalf of Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc (Rossler, Paul)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Miller Mendel Inc . (Nelson, Todd)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kurt M. Rylander) Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2787873 by Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Request for Admission PHV)(Nelson, Todd)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Todd A Nelson on behalf of Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc (Nelson, Todd)
October 9, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2787755. (Nelson, Todd)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oklahoma City City of. (kmt)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oklahoma City City of filed by Miller Mendel Inc, Tyler Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - United States Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller Mendel Inc et al v. Oklahoma City City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller Mendel Inc
Represented By: Todd A Nelson
Represented By: Paul E Rossler
Represented By: Kurt M Rylander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Miller
Represented By: Todd A Nelson
Represented By: Paul E Rossler
Represented By: Kurt M Rylander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma City City of
Represented By: Evan W Talley
Represented By: Douglas J Sorocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?