Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan et al v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc, Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan and Bios Companies Inc
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Mallinckrodt plc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, SPECGX LLC, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Noramco Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc and Anda Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv00994
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Docket Annotation: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:18-op-46186, filed 10/26/2018. (kmt)
October 25, 2018 Docket Annotation: This case has been transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (kmt)
October 25, 2018 Filing 23 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt)
October 24, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Actavis LLC served on 10/19/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Actavis Pharma Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Allergan plc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 10/17/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Anda Inc served on 10/17/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Cardinal Health Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Cephalon Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Insys Therapeutic Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Mallinckrodt LLC served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). McKesson Corporation served on 10/17/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Purdue Pharma Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 10/19/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bios Companies Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan, Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(as Plan Sponsor and Fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan, Individually). Watson Laboratories Inc served on 10/18/2018. (Spencer, Mark)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard D Nix on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nix, Richard)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (kmt)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon P Long on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Long, Brandon)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D Spencer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spencer, Mark)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Henry D Hoss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hoss, Henry)
October 9, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Plaintiffs' Original Complaint and Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2788393. (Hoss, Henry)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc filed by Bios Companies Inc(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan(Individually), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(on behalf of all others similarly situated and as plan sponsor and fiduciary of Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(Individually), Bios Companies Inc(on behalf of all others similarly situated and as plan sponsor and fiduciary of Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan), Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan et al v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc Employee Benefits Plan
Represented By: Richard D Nix
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Brandon P Long
Represented By: Mark D Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Telephone Cooperative Inc
Represented By: Richard D Nix
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Brandon P Long
Represented By: Mark D Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bios Companies Inc Welfare Plan
Represented By: Richard D Nix
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Brandon P Long
Represented By: Mark D Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bios Companies Inc
Represented By: Richard D Nix
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Represented By: Brandon P Long
Represented By: Mark D Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?