Adams v. Wyatt

Plaintiff: Guadalupe Adams
Defendant: William C Wyatt
Case Number: 5:2018cv00998
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Amer. w/Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Guadalupe Adams (Monismith, Pete)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guadalupe Adams. William C Wyatt served on 10/29/2018. (Monismith, Pete)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE (other) by Guadalupe Adams of Association with Local Counsel (Monismith, Pete)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Pete M Monismith on behalf of Guadalupe Adams (Monismith, Pete)
October 11, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2789550. (Monismith, Pete)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to William C Wyatt. (em)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William C Wyatt filed by Guadalupe Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Adams
Represented By: Pete M Monismith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?