Gage v. Rashidzada et al
Plaintiff: Denton William Gage
Defendant: Sandeepkumar R Singh, James S Walker, Virginia Banks, Abid Zahoor, Sachidanandan Naidu, Omar Rashidzada, Judy A Forshee, Angela C Houston and Scott Albright
Case Number: 5:2018cv01000
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend Defendants by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
November 14, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Request to Staff, #2 Attachment 2 - Acts of Constituting Rule Violation Literature, #3 Envelope)(nv)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot #24 Plaintiff Request of Subpoena. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 11/7/18. (jw)
November 6, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Order titled, "Request of Subpoena Duces Tecum" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Order Denying Req. for Recs. in Tulsa County OK, #2 Envelope)(nv)
November 6, 2018 Filing 23 JUDGMENT; In accordance with the Court's order entered this date, judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 11/6/18. (jw)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #10 Report and Recommendation. This matter id Dismissed without Prejudice, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 11/6/18. (jw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 21 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #10 filed by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 -ODOC Offender Statement Report, #2 Attachment 2 - Progress Notes, #3 Envelope)(nv)
October 25, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Stipulate Authenticity of Exhibit DE-2" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 25, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Order titled, "Request to Amend #18 Submission DT-2" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Affidavit In Forma Pauperis, #2 Envelope) (nv).
October 25, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Order, titled "Request of Subpoena Duces Tecum" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 25, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Order titled, "Request of Subpena Duces Tecum" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 25, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Order titled, "Request of Subpoena Duces Tecum" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Order titled, "Petition to Amend Defendants" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Order titled, "Request for Summons" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Order titled, "Request for Service" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Order titled, "Request for Subpoena Duces Tecum" by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Because Plaintiff does not have a basis for relief under either 1983 or Bivens the undersigned recommends the court dismiss Plaintiff's complaint, Doc. 1, without prejudice. re #8 #2 #1 #7 ( Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2018), This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/23/2018. (sr)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Order titled, "Petition for Hearing Via Telecommunication" by Denton William Gage. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Include Documentary and Electronic Evidence" by Denton William Gage. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/15/18. (jw)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones recused. The Clerk of Court is directed to return the case to the regular procedure for random selection so that a successor Magistrate Judge may be determined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/15/2018. (dwl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Enter ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. Entered by the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 10/10/18. (nv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases. (nv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Albright, Virginia Banks, Judy A Forshee, Angela C Houston, Sachidanandan Naidu, Omar Rashidzada, Sandeepkumar R Singh, James S Walker, Abid Zahoor filed by Denton William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Statement of the Facts, #2 Envelope)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gage v. Rashidzada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandeepkumar R Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abid Zahoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sachidanandan Naidu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Rashidzada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy A Forshee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela C Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denton William Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?