Greater First Deliverance Temple Inc v. GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Greater First Deliverance Temple Inc
Defendant: GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv01022
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY by Defendant GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company re #7 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company. (Khoury, Stephanie)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greater First Deliverance Temple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11-15-18 letter)(Bethea, Kenyatta)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Greg D Givens on behalf of GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company (Givens, Greg)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephanie L Khoury on behalf of GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company (Khoury, Stephanie)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company. (Khoury, Stephanie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greater First Deliverance Temple Inc. GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company served on 10/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment GREEN CARD)(Bethea, Kenyatta)
October 17, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2793536. (Bethea, Kenyatta)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company. (ml)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company filed by Greater First Deliverance Temple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater First Deliverance Temple Inc v. GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Khoury
Represented By: Greg D Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater First Deliverance Temple Inc
Represented By: Kenyatta R Bethea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?