Pitt v. Antonelli et al

Plaintiff: Richard Pitt
Defendant: FNU Hicks, FNU Cooper, FNU Reese, FNU Seiga, B Antonelli, M Tower and FNU Barr
Case Number: 5:2018cv01102
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard Pitt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Pitt. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE (other) by Richard Pitt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES ~ The Court ordered Plaintiff to cure the deficiencies on or before December 5, 2018, #5 , but he has not complied.Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies above no later than January 2, 2019. Failure to comply with this second Order will likely result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 12/10/2018. (dwl)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES ~ Plaintiff did not submit an in forma pauperis motion or pay the filing fee to the Court. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies above no later than December 5, 2018. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 11/14/2018. (dwl)
November 9, 2018 Notice of Mailing of Doc. No. #1 , #3 , #4 and LCvR5.4/Change of Address form to Richard Pitt #08728-067 POLLOCK-FCI MED P O Box 4050 Pollock, LA 71467-4050 (ml)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. Entered at the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 11/9/2018. (ml)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable David L. Russell for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/9/2018. (ml)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 PREVIOUS Cases (ml)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B Antonelli, FNU Barr, FNU Cooper, FNU Hicks, FNU Reese, FNU Seiga, M Tower filed by Richard Pitt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Addendum, #2 Envelope)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitt v. Antonelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Seiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?