Collins v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: James Collins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2018cv01113
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for complaint served on US attorney on 11/23/2018, filed by Plaintiff James Collins. (Laue, Darcie)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for complaint served on Attorney General on 11/21/2018, filed by Plaintiff James Collins. (Laue, Darcie)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by James Collins. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 11/19/2018. (Laue, Darcie)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cps)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Let the applicant proceed without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/13/2018. (cps)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Collins. (ac)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by James Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Collins
Represented By: Darcie K Laue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?