Draper v. United States

Plaintiff: Ernest Draper
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 5:2018cv01114
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SECOND ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES ~ Plaintiff Draper shall file the complaint and application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, on the Court-provided forms, no later than February 1, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order will likely result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/11/2019. (dwl)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ~ Plaintiff Draper shall file the complaint and application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, on the Court-provided forms, no later than January 2, 2018. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 12/10/2018. (dwl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 Enter ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. Entered at the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 12/07/18. (nv)
November 23, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to file Amended Complaint, by Ernest Draper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00321.
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER. Case transferred to the Western District of Oklahoma. No further filings shall be accepted in this case file in this district. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ernest Draper received in response to deficiency letter. (AY, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 *** Prisoner Acknowledgment and Authorization by Ernest Draper received in response to deficiency letter. (AY, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 ***Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by: Ernest Draper filed in response to deficiency letter. (AY, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ernest Draper. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO FILE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Ernest Draper. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Be Moved to Federal Custody by Ernest Draper. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
October 18, 2018 ***LAW CLERK 02 ASSIGNED (BF, Paralegal) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, #2 Acknowledgment and Authorization) (AY, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/15/2018 to correct plaintiff's first name. ECF Number #3 Letter from Clerk was not sent to plaintiff. (AY, Case Administrator). [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Application to Proceed IFP, #2 Acknowledgment and Authorization) (AY, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/15/2018. Plaintiff's name is incorrect on this letter. Letter was not sent to plaintiff, See ECF #4 which replaces this document. (AY, Case Administrator). [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 ***Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by: Ernest Draper. (AY, Case Administrator) Modified on 10/15/2018 to correct plaintiff's first name in docket text. (AY, Case Administrator). [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT - Receipt # none (IFP) Filed by Ernest Draper.(AY, Case Administrator) (Additional attachments added on 10/15/2018: #1 Transmittal Envelope) (AY, Case Administrator). Modified on 10/15/2018 to correct plaintiff's first name in docket text. (AY, Case Administrator). [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?