Crawford v. Express Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Geraldina Crawford
Defendant: Express Services Inc and Aecom Technical Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv01127
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 2/21/2019. (md)
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Express Services by Geraldina Crawford. (Roper, Leah)
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Aecom Technical Services Inc.(Albert, Victor)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Aecom Technical Services Inc answer due 12/21/2018.. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/7/2018. (md)
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Aecom Technical Services Inc. (Albert, Victor)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Express Services Inc answer due 12/14/2018.. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 11/30/2018. (md)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Express Services Inc. (Thrutchley, Christopher)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Aecom Technical Services Inc answer due 12/7/2018.. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 11/26/2018. (md)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Express Services Inc answer due 11/30/2018.. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 11/26/2018. (md)
November 23, 2018 Filing 10 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Express Services Inc. (Thrutchley, Christopher)
November 23, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Ellen A Adams on behalf of Express Services Inc (Adams, Ellen)
November 23, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher S Thrutchley on behalf of Express Services Inc (Thrutchley, Christopher)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant AECOM Technical Services, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for a Two-Week Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Aecom Technical Services Inc. (Albert, Victor)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Victor F Albert on behalf of Aecom Technical Services Inc (Albert, Victor)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin P Grose on behalf of Aecom Technical Services Inc (Grose, Justin)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by D Colby Addison on behalf of Geraldina Crawford (Addison, D)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Geraldina Crawford. (Roper, Leah)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Leah M Roper on behalf of Geraldina Crawford (Roper, Leah)
November 16, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2813391. (Albert, Victor)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-5589 filed by Aecom Technical Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - EOA - Colby Addison, #5 Exhibit 5 - EOA- Leah Roper, #6 Exhibit 6 - Return of Service - Express, #7 Exhibit 7 - Return of Service - AECOM, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Court Notice, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Express Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldina Crawford
Represented By: D Colby Addison
Represented By: Leah M Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Services Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Thrutchley
Represented By: Ellen A Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aecom Technical Services Inc
Represented By: Victor F Albert
Represented By: Justin P Grose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?