Green v. Deso et al
Plaintiff: LaShawn Ray Green
Defendant: John D Doak, Anna Denman, Curtis Pletcher and Robert Deso
Case Number: 5:2018cv01154
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Referring Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from LaShawn Green (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ac)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND ORDER to Cure Deficiency regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court sua sponte extends Plaintiff's compliance deadline for thirty days from the date of this Order, that is, until Wednesday, February 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 1/7/19. (lb)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER from LaShawn Green (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ac)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LaShawn Ray Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Transaction Details, #2 Envelope)(kr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER from LaShawn Green (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LaShawn Ray Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kr)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Response filed by LaShawn Ray Green. Plaintiff's request is premature. If, closer to the December 26, 2018 deadline, the authorities have not returned the necessary forms to Plaintiff, he may then request a request for an extension of time to cure his deficiency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 12/11/18. (lb)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER from LaShawn Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kr)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LaShawn Ray Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kr)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Cure Deficiency regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court orders Plaintiff to cure the deficiency on or before 12/26/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 11/26/18. (lb)
November 23, 2018 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell.Entered by the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/23/2018. (ac)
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 NO PREVIOUS Cases (ac)
November 23, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LaShawn Ray Green. (ac)
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by LaShawn Ray Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ac) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/23/2018) to delete blank pages (ac). Modified on 11/23/2018 (ac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Deso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Doak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Denman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Pletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Deso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShawn Ray Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?