Jim v. Shawnee City of et al

Plaintiff: Latosha Jim
Defendant: Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners, Shawnee City of, John Does, Pottawatomie County Public Safety Center Trust, John Roes, John Smiths, Mike Booth and Kevin Nichols
Case Number: 5:2018cv01168
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 11/15/2019; Jury instructions due 11/15/2019; Voir dire requests due 11/15/2019; Trial briefs due 11/15/2019; Discovery due by 9/1/2019. Jury Trial set on the court's 12/2019 trial docket in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Joe Heaton. Motions due by 9/15/2019. Pretrial Report due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 1/3/2019. (cla)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER striking the 01/04/2019 scheduling conference...see separate scheduling order for specific deadlines; initial disclosures if not already made shall be made not later than 01/07/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 1/3/2019. (cla)
December 27, 2018 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint & Status Report by Latosha Jim. (McKimmey, Joseph)
December 26, 2018 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendants Mike Booth, Kevin Nichols, Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners, Pottawatomie County Public Safety Center Trust, Shawnee City of. (Tyler, Taylor)
December 14, 2018 17 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by All Plaintiffs . (McKimmey, Joseph) Modified on 12/18/2018 to correct docket text (nv).
December 13, 2018 16 Initial Disclosures by Latosha Jim Rule 26 Discloxure. (McKimmey, Joseph) Modified on 12/14/2018 to correct docket text(nv).
December 10, 2018 15 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 01/04/2019 @ 10:40 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Status Report due by 12/26/2018. (cla)
December 6, 2018 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert S Lafferrandre on behalf of Kevin Nichols, Shawnee City of (Lafferrandre, Robert)
December 5, 2018 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kevin Nichols.(Smith, Carson)
December 5, 2018 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Shawnee City of.(Smith, Carson)
December 5, 2018 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Carson C Smith on behalf of Kevin Nichols, Shawnee City of (Smith, Carson)
December 5, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mike Booth.(Poe, Wellon)
December 5, 2018 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners.(Poe, Wellon)
December 5, 2018 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Taylor M Tyler on behalf of Mike Booth, Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners (Tyler, Taylor)
December 5, 2018 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Wellon B Poe, Jr on behalf of Mike Booth, Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners (Poe, Wellon)
December 5, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Pottawatomie County Public Safety Center Trust.(Poe, Wellon)
December 5, 2018 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Taylor M Tyler on behalf of Pottawatomie County Public Safety Center Trust (Tyler, Taylor)
December 5, 2018 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Wellon B Poe, Jr on behalf of Pottawatomie County Public Safety Center Trust (Poe, Wellon)
December 5, 2018 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E McKimmey on behalf of Latosha Jim (McKimmey, Joseph)
November 30, 2018 2 Receipt for Money Received from Kevin Nichols, Shawnee City of in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500071020 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (em)
November 29, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Pottawatomie County, case number CJ-18-433 filed by Shawnee City of, Kevin Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons to City of Shawnee, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons to Kevin Nichols, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jim v. Shawnee City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottawatomie County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Wellon B Poe, Jr
Represented By: Taylor M Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee City of
Represented By: Carson C Smith
Represented By: Robert S Lafferrandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottawatomie County Public Safety Center Trust
Represented By: Wellon B Poe, Jr
Represented By: Taylor M Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smiths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Booth
Represented By: Wellon B Poe, Jr
Represented By: Taylor M Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Nichols
Represented By: Carson C Smith
Represented By: Robert S Lafferrandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latosha Jim
Represented By: Joseph E McKimmey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?