Cagle v. Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd
Plaintiff: Earnest Cagle
Defendant: Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd
Case Number: 5:2018cv01209
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 SURREPLY re #9 Response to Motion,,,,, #10 Reply to Response to Motion, #3 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Earnest Cagle. (Laird, Jeff)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 1/29/19. (jw)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Earnest Cagle. (Laird, Jeff)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd. (Cartwright, Micah)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Earnest Cagle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint from Walters v. Sears et al, #2 Exhibit 2-Service of Complaint in Walters v. Sears, #3 Exhibit 3-Answer in Walters v. Sears et al, #4 Exhibit 4-Depo Excerpts from Depo of George Ku, #5 Exhibit 5-PTS's Rule 7.1 Corp Disclosure Statement, #6 Exhibit 6-PTS's Disclosure of Corp Affiliations, #7 Exhibit 7-After Sales Services of Rexon, #8 Exhibit 8-PTS's MTD in One World v. Robert Bosch Corp et al, #9 Exhibit 9-Complaint in France v. Rexon et al, #10 Exhibit 10-Answer in France v. Rexon et al, #11 Exhibit 11-Depo Trans of George Ku in Diltz v. Rexon, #12 Exhibit 12-Rexon's Memo or Points & Auths in Yang v. Rexon et al, #13 Exhibit 13-Order Denying MTD in Yang v. Rexon, #14 Exhibit 14-Declaration of Teresa Monroe in Yang v. Rexon, #15 Exhibit 15-Complaint in Decristoforo v. Rexon, #16 Exhibit 16-Answer to 1st Amended Complain in Decristoforo, #17 Exhibit 17-Answer to Amended Complaint in Tuttle v. Sears et al, #18 Exhibit 18-Answer in Robison v. Rexon et al, #19 Exhibit 19-Answer in Lawson v. Techtronic et al, #20 Exhibit 20-Answer in Thur v. Sears et al, #21 Exhibit 21-Rexon Webpage printou, #22 Exhibit 22-Affidavit of Earnest Cagle, #23 Exhibit 23-Safety Notice sent to Cagle)(Laird, Jeff)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #8 Response to Motion STRICKEN, due to counsel's failure to comply with ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(A)(4)(a). (ml)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN: RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Earnest Cagle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Laird, Jeff) Modified on 1/4/2019 (ml).
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard A Schuster on behalf of Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd (Schuster, Richard)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard A. Schuster. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/20/18. (jw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2834103 by Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Cartwright, Micah)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeff R Laird, Jr on behalf of Earnest Cagle (Laird, Jeff)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Chen, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Holbrook)(Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Alexandra G Ah Loy on behalf of Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd (Ah Loy, Alexandra)
December 13, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2829431. (Cartwright, Micah)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2018-1414 filed by Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cagle v. Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexon Industrial Corp Ltd
Represented By: Micah B Cartwright
Represented By: Alexandra G Ah Loy
Represented By: Richard A Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest Cagle
Represented By: Jeff R Laird, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?