Cain v. Ponca City Independent School District I-71 et al

Plaintiff: Amanda Porter Cain
Defendant: Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Thad Dilbeck, Bret Smith, Avery Markus Kellen Revard, Shelly Arrott, David Pennington, KGC, Ponca City Board of Education of the Ponca City Independent School District I-71 and Ponca City Public Schools
Case Number: 5:2018cv01228
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2019 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shelly Arrott(Individually), Thad Dilbeck(Individually), KGC(a minor child, jointly and severally), KGC(a minor child, individually), David Pennington(Individually), Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Avery Markus Kellen Revard(Jointly and severally), Avery Markus Kellen Revard(Individually), Bret Smith(Individually) filed by Amanda Porter Cain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PCPS adopted rules)(Lee, C)
February 1, 2019 14 ENTRY of Appearance by John D White on behalf of KGC(a minor child, jointly and severally) (White, John)
February 1, 2019 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by KGC(a minor child, jointly and severally).(Money, Eric)
January 29, 2019 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Shelly Arrott(Individually), Shelly Arrott(Official capacity, Superintendent), Thad Dilbeck(Official capacity, Principal), Thad Dilbeck(Individually), Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Bret Smith(Official capacity, Title IX Coordinator), Bret Smith(Individually).(Richardson, Jerry)
January 29, 2019 11 MOTION to Dismiss Procedural Due Process Claim, Title IX and Official Capacity Claims Against School Employees, and All Claims Against Board of Education with Combined Brief in Support by Shelly Arrott(Individually), Shelly Arrott(Official capacity, Superintendent), Thad Dilbeck(Official capacity, Principal), Thad Dilbeck(Individually), Ponca City Board of Education of the Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Bret Smith(Official capacity, Title IX Coordinator), Bret Smith(Individually). (Richardson, Jerry)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, KGC(a minor child, jointly and severally) answer due 2/1/2019; KGC(a minor child, individually) answer due 2/1/2019.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/28/2019. (mb)
January 24, 2019 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by KGC(a minor child, individually). (Money, Eric)
January 24, 2019 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric C Money on behalf of KGC(a minor child, individually) (Money, Eric)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Shelly Arrott(Official capacity, Superintendent) answer due 1/29/2019; Thad Dilbeck(Official capacity, Principal) answer due 1/29/2019; Thad Dilbeck(Individually) answer due 1/29/2019; Ponca City Board of Education of the Ponca City Independent School District I-71 answer due 1/29/2019; Ponca City Independent School District I-71 answer due 1/29/2019; Bret Smith(Official capacity, Title IX Coordinator) answer due 1/29/2019; Bret Smith(Individually) answer due 1/29/2019.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/9/2019. (mb)
January 7, 2019 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Plead by Shelly Arrott(Individually), Shelly Arrott(Official capacity, Superintendent), Thad Dilbeck(Official capacity, Principal), Thad Dilbeck(Individually), Ponca City Board of Education of the Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Bret Smith(Official capacity, Title IX Coordinator), Bret Smith(Individually). (Richardson, Jerry)
January 7, 2019 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jerry A Richardson on behalf of Shelly Arrott(Individually), Shelly Arrott(Official capacity, Superintendent), Thad Dilbeck(Official capacity, Principal), Thad Dilbeck(Individually), Ponca City Board of Education of the Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Bret Smith(Official capacity, Title IX Coordinator), Bret Smith(Individually) (Richardson, Jerry)
January 7, 2019 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Adam S Breipohl on behalf of Shelly Arrott(Individually), Shelly Arrott(Official capacity, Superintendent), Thad Dilbeck(Official capacity, Principal), Thad Dilbeck(Individually), Ponca City Board of Education of the Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Bret Smith(Official capacity, Title IX Coordinator), Bret Smith(Individually) (Breipohl, Adam)
January 7, 2019 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Frederick J Hegenbart on behalf of Shelly Arrott(Individually), Shelly Arrott(Official capacity, Superintendent), Thad Dilbeck(Official capacity, Principal), Thad Dilbeck(Individually), Ponca City Board of Education of the Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Bret Smith(Official capacity, Title IX Coordinator), Bret Smith(Individually) (Hegenbart, Frederick)
December 18, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2832676. (Lee, C)
December 17, 2018 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (ml)
December 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Shelly Arrott(Individually), Shelly Arrott(Official capacity, Superintendent), Thad Dilbeck(Official capacity, Principal), Thad Dilbeck(Individually), KGC(a minor child, jointly and severally), KGC(a minor child, individually), David Pennington(Official capacity, Superintendent), David Pennington(Individually), Ponca City Board of Education of the Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Ponca City Independent School District I-71, Avery Markus Kellen Revard(Jointly and severally), Avery Markus Kellen Revard(Individually), Bret Smith(Official capacity, Title IX Coordinator), Bret Smith(Individually) filed by Amanda Porter Cain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Anti-harassment Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cain v. Ponca City Independent School District I-71 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponca City Independent School District I-71
Represented By: Frederick J Hegenbart
Represented By: Jerry A Richardson
Represented By: Adam S Breipohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thad Dilbeck
Represented By: Frederick J Hegenbart
Represented By: Jerry A Richardson
Represented By: Adam S Breipohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Smith
Represented By: Frederick J Hegenbart
Represented By: Jerry A Richardson
Represented By: Adam S Breipohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Markus Kellen Revard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Arrott
Represented By: Frederick J Hegenbart
Represented By: Jerry A Richardson
Represented By: Adam S Breipohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KGC
Represented By: Eric C Money
Represented By: John D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponca City Board of Education of the Ponca City Independent School District I-71
Represented By: Frederick J Hegenbart
Represented By: Jerry A Richardson
Represented By: Adam S Breipohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponca City Public Schools
Represented By: Frederick J Hegenbart
Represented By: Jerry A Richardson
Represented By: Adam S Breipohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Porter Cain
Represented By: C Paige Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?