Bors v. Board of Regents for the Regional University System of Oklahoma

Plaintiff: Veronica Tyler Bors
Defendant: Board of Regents for the Regional University System of Oklahoma and University of Central Oklahoma
Case Number: 5:2018cv01235
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 FIRST MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Veronica Tyler Bors. (Roper, Leah)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2019 10:30 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 2/25/2019. (jw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Board of Regents for the Regional University System of Oklahoma.(Norwood, Lexie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by University of Central Oklahoma.(Norwood, Lexie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Lexie P Norwood on behalf of University of Central Oklahoma (Norwood, Lexie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard N Mann on behalf of University of Central Oklahoma (Mann, Richard)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Tyler Bors. University of Central Oklahoma served on 1/2/2019. (Roper, Leah)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to University of Central Oklahoma. (nv)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Board of Regents for the Regional University System of Oklahoma filed by Veronica Tyler Bors.(Roper, Leah)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs Amended Complaint shall be filed within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/26/18. (jw)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Petition by Veronica Tyler Bors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint)(Roper, Leah)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Leah M Roper on behalf of Veronica Tyler Bors (Roper, Leah)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Veronica Tyler Bors. (Addison, D)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by D Colby Addison on behalf of Veronica Tyler Bors (Addison, D)
December 18, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2833034. (Norwood, Lexie)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Lexie P Norwood on behalf of Board of Regents for the Regional University System of Oklahoma (Norwood, Lexie)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard N Mann on behalf of Board of Regents for the Regional University System of Oklahoma (Mann, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma District County Court, case number CJ-2018-6463 filed by Board of Regents for the Regional University System of Oklahoma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Case Details, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018-11-26 - EOA - Leah Roper for Pl, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2018-11-26 - EOA - Colby Addison for Pl, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2018-11-26 - Petition, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bors v. Board of Regents for the Regional University System of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents for the Regional University System of Oklahoma
Represented By: Lexie P Norwood
Represented By: Richard N Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Central Oklahoma
Represented By: Richard N Mann
Represented By: Lexie P Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Tyler Bors
Represented By: D Colby Addison
Represented By: Leah M Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?