Harrison v Lake et al

Plaintiff: Maxie T Harrison and Kaye Harrison
Defendant: Ed Lake and Becky Pasternik-Ikard
Case Number: 5:2018cv01244
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Hearing on #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support: Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 502 before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Response due by 2/25/2019. Any reply due by 2/27/2019. Plf's witness & exhibit lists due 2/21/2019. Dfts' witness & exhibit lists due 2/26/2019. Proposed findings of fact & conclusions of law due 3/4/2019. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/11/2019. (llg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OAC 340:65-3-7, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kaye Harrison)(Parks, Aaron)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER declaring moot #7 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/4/2019. (llg)
February 4, 2019 NOTICE from the Court re #8 First Amended Complaint. Counsel for plaintiffs is DIRECTED, in future filings, to comply with the court's ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II.A.4.a. - "... A description [more than just the exhibit no.] of the numbered exhibit must be provided in the docket entry...." Failure to comply in the future may result in filings being stricken. (llg)
February 2, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22)(Parks, Aaron)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Due to Mootness by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Denial, #2 Exhibit Court Order)(Dewey, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by John J Dewey on behalf of Ed Lake (Dewey, John)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan L Eads on behalf of Becky Pasternik-Ikard (Eads, Susan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Receipt for Money Received from Maxie T Harrison in the amount of $400.00, receipt number 1087-2843861 regarding #1 Complaint (ac)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Maxie T Harrison. The court is in receipt of the complaint which includes in Count III a request for a preliminary injunction. The court advises plaintiff that this request will not be taken upby the court, and that no preliminary injunction hearing will be set by virtue of the filing of the complaint alone. Rather, if plaintiff intends to press this request, plaintiff is required to file a separate motion for preliminary injunction and supporting brief. If plaintiff seeks a hearing on the motion for a preliminary injunction, the request shall be set out in the motion. Defendants shall be entitled to respond to the motion. The court will then set the matter for hearing, if appropriate. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/21/18. (kr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ed Lake, Becky Pasternik-Ikard. (kr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ed Lake, Becky Pasternik-Ikard filed by Maxie T Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v Lake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxie T Harrison
Represented By: Aaron C Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaye Harrison
Represented By: Aaron C Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Lake
Represented By: John J Dewey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Pasternik-Ikard
Represented By: Susan L Eads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?