Reed v. Grady County Board of County Commissioners et al

Plaintiff: Demon Jay Reed
Defendant: Grady County Board of County Commissioners, Jim Weir, Grady County Sheriffs Office and Phillip McCarthey
Case Number: 5:2018cv01257
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jim Weir(individually), Jim Weir(official capacity).(Geries, Stephen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Taylor M Tyler on behalf of Jim Weir(individually), Jim Weir(official capacity) (Tyler, Taylor)
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen L Geries on behalf of Jim Weir(individually), Jim Weir(official capacity) (Geries, Stephen)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Grady County Sheriff's Office Only without Prejudice by Demon Jay Reed. (Hammons, Chris)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Phillip McCarthey.(Geries, Stephen)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demon Jay Reed. Jim Weir(individually) served on 1/25/2019. (Hicks, Jason)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Grady County Board of County Commissioners.(Geries, Stephen)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Grady County Sheriffs Office. (Geries, Stephen)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Taylor M Tyler on behalf of Grady County Board of County Commissioners, Grady County Sheriffs Office, Phillip McCarthey (Tyler, Taylor)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen L Geries on behalf of Grady County Board of County Commissioners, Grady County Sheriffs Office, Phillip McCarthey (Geries, Stephen)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demon Jay Reed. Phillip McCarthey served on 1/8/2019. (Hicks, Jason)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demon Jay Reed. Grady County Sheriffs Office served on 12/28/2018. (Hicks, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demon Jay Reed. Grady County Board of County Commissioners served on 12/28/2018. (Hicks, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demon Jay Reed. Grady County Board of County Commissioners served on 12/28/2018. (Hicks, Jason)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demon Jay Reed. Grady County Board of County Commissioners served on 1/2/2019. (Hicks, Jason)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason Michael Hicks on behalf of Demon Jay Reed (Hicks, Jason)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Demon Jay Reed. (Hammons, Chris)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Chris J Hammons on behalf of Demon Jay Reed (Hammons, Chris)
December 27, 2018 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2836925. (Hammons, Chris)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Grady County Board of County Commissioners, Grady County Sheriffs Office, Phillip McCarthey, Jim Weir(individually), Jim Weir(official capacity). (ml)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grady County Board of County Commissioners, Grady County Sheriffs Office, Phillip McCarthey, Jim Weir(individually), Jim Weir(official capacity) filed by Demon Jay Reed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Grady County Board of County Commissioners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Stephen L Geries
Represented By: Taylor M Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Weir
Represented By: Stephen L Geries
Represented By: Taylor M Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grady County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: Stephen L Geries
Represented By: Taylor M Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip McCarthey
Represented By: Stephen L Geries
Represented By: Taylor M Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demon Jay Reed
Represented By: Jason Michael Hicks
Represented By: Chris J Hammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?