Schmitt v. Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC

Plaintiff: Megan R Schmitt
Defendant: Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv01259
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 2/28/2019. (llg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC.(Hitt, Brion)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC's answer or other responsive pldg due 2/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/29/2019. (llg)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by J Mark McAlester on behalf of Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC (McAlester, J)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC. (Hitt, Brion)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Brion B Hitt on behalf of Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC (Hitt, Brion)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC. (ac)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Tanner B France on behalf of All Plaintiffs (France, Tanner)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Geoffrey A Tabor on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tabor, Geoffrey)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan M Irwin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Irwin, Jonathan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Barrett T Bowers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bowers, Barrett)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Woodrow K Glass on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Glass, Woodrow)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Stanley M Ward on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ward, Stanley)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from Megan R Schmitt in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW50071542 regarding #1 Complaint (ac)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC filed by Megan R Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmitt v. Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collision Works of Oklahoma LLC
Represented By: Brion B Hitt
Represented By: J Mark McAlester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan R Schmitt
Represented By: Woodrow K Glass
Represented By: Stanley M Ward
Represented By: Jonathan M Irwin
Represented By: Barrett T Bowers
Represented By: Tanner B France
Represented By: Geoffrey A Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?